Gibbs-Guidry v. The CIT Group/Consumer Finance, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Gibbs-Guidry
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registrations Systems, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, As Trustee, The CIT Group/Consumer Finance, Inc. and The Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 4:2020cv02075
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 Final DISMISSAL. On the notice of dismissal, this case is dismissed with prejudice #5 . Case terminated on 8/3/2020. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Gwendolyn Gibbs-Guidry by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon, The CIT Group/Consumer Finance, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registrations Systems, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McInnis, Walter)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order: Initial Conference set for 8/3/2020 at 11:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(JacquelineMataadi, 4)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registrations Systems, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, As Trustee, filed.(McInnis, Walter)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 240th Judicial District court for Fort Bend County, Texas, case number 20-dcv-273714 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24792568) filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon, As Trustee, Mortgage Electronic Registrations Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(McInnis, Walter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibbs-Guidry v. The CIT Group/Consumer Finance, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Walter Lewis Edmond McInnis
Represented By: C Charles Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registrations Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Walter Lewis Edmond McInnis
Represented By: C Charles Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon, As Trustee
Represented By: Walter Lewis Edmond McInnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The CIT Group/Consumer Finance, Inc.
Represented By: Walter Lewis Edmond McInnis
Represented By: C Charles Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Walter Lewis Edmond McInnis
Represented By: C Charles Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Gibbs-Guidry
Represented By: Rhonda Shedrick Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?