VNS Consultants, LLC v. Ipsum Diagnostics, LLC
Plaintiff: VNS Consultants, LLC
Defendant: Ipsum Diagnostics, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv02077
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Peter Bray
Referring Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 General Reference to Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. The initial conference set for 9/8/2020 before Judge Lynn N. Hughes is cancelled. (ghassan, 4)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 9/8/2020 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(JacquelineMataadi, 4)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ipsum Diagnostics, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24793430) filed by VNS Consultants, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hendershot, Simon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VNS Consultants, LLC v. Ipsum Diagnostics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ipsum Diagnostics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VNS Consultants, LLC
Represented By: Simon W Hendershot, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?