Harris v. Bank of America N.A.
Plaintiff: Midhat Bilal Harris
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Case Number: 4:2020cv02482
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Christina A Bryan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER. Trial Term: Jury. ETT: 2 Days. Jury. Amended Pleadings due by 10/15/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 10/15/2020 Pltf Expert Report due by 3/15/2021. Deft Expert Report due by 4/15/2021. Discovery due by 5/14/2021. Mediation due by 6/15/2021. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 7/15/2021. Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/16/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 701 before Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan Jury Trial set for 8/23/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 701 before Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan(Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified.(cjan, 4)
September 11, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 9/11/2020. Scheduling order issued. Trial is set for 8/23/2020. Appearances:Midhat Bilal Harris - Pro Se. Heather Nicole Sutton.(Court Reporter: K. Miller), filed.(cjan, 4)
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER of Scheduling, filed.(Sutton, Heather)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified.(cjan, 4)
August 18, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Bank of America N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sutton, Heather)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Scheduling Conference set for 9/11/2020 at 11:30 AM in by telephone before Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan, filed. (cjan, 4)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Bank of America N.A., Midhat Bilal Harris and ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan. Judge Sim Lake no longer assigned to the case. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Answer due by 8/21/2020.) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Midhat Bilal Harris, filed.(agould, 3)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Bank of America N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sutton, Heather)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Bank of America N.A., filed.(Sutton, Heather)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (JosephWellsadi, 4)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of America N.A. identifying Bank of America Corporation as Corporate Parent, filed.(Sutton, Heather)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 240th JDC, Fort Bend County, case number 20-DCV-274227 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24929358) filed by Bank of America N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sutton, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Bank of America N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midhat Bilal Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Heather Nicole Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?