Dutchover v. Davis
Petitioner: Brian Dutchover
Respondent: Lorie Davis
Case Number: 4:2020cv02522
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Charles Eskridge
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from Brian Dutchover re: status of case, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Brian Dutchover re: Filing Fee, filed. (jdav, 4)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Brian Dutchover re: Filing Fee, filed. (BeverlyWright, 4)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Brian Dutchover, filed.(BeverlyWright, 4)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING as to Brian Dutchover. Parties notified Notice of Compliance due by 8/19/2020, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (bgoolsby, 4)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (ShoshanaArnow, 4)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Support by Brian Dutchover, filed.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Brian Dutchover.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dutchover v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian Dutchover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis
Represented By: Edward Larry Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?