Centauri Specialty Insurance Company v. Phillips et al
Plaintiff: Centauri Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Shawn Sabu and Joshua Phillips
Case Number: 4:2020cv02525
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Shawn Sabu, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Munoz's Fourth Amended Petition)(Nguyen, Don)
August 2, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Joshua Phillips served on 7/23/2020, answer due 9/21/2020, filed.(Nader, James)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Centauri Specialty Insurance Company, filed.(Nader, James)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Shawn Sabu served on 7/24/2020, answer due 8/14/2020, filed.(Nader, James)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ChristopherSarrat, 4)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/12/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(DawnWaggoneradi, 4)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Joshua Phillips, Shawn Sabu, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Rumbley, Charles)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joshua Phillips, Shawn Sabu (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24941072) filed by Centauri Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Rumbley, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centauri Specialty Insurance Company v. Phillips et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centauri Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: James P Nader
Represented By: Charles Robert Rumbley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Sabu
Represented By: Don Tuan Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?