Taylor v. Collier et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Taylor
Defendant: Bryan Collier, Debra Gibbs, Lonnie E. Townsend and Justin Thomas
Case Number: 4:2020cv02527
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 11 CLERKS NOTICE to Prisoner. Parties notified, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (bgoolsby, 4)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from Kenneth Taylor re: status of case., filed. (bgoolsby, 4)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from Kenneth Taylor re: transmitting evidence exhibits for attachment to complaint, filed. (jdav, 4)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 NONCONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Kenneth Taylor, filed.(gkelner, 4)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Emergency Injunctive Relief and Request for Expedited Action by Kenneth Taylor, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/6/2020. (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to Suspend Rule for Two Copies by Kenneth Taylor, filed.(ClaudiaGutierrez, 4)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM of LAW in Support of 42 U.S.C. 1983 by Kenneth Taylor, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(ClaudiaGutierrez, 4)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Kenneth Taylor, filed. (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Kenneth Taylor, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/6/2020. (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Kenneth Taylor.(ClaudiaGutierrez, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Collier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonnie E. Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?