Longoria v. Saul
Plaintiff: Theresa A Longoria
Defendant: Andrew Saul, William Pelham Barr and Ryan K. Patrick
Case Number: 4:2020cv02546
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Charles Eskridge
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Summons Not Issued as to William Pelham Barr Due to these deficiencies: Error in address. Missing address number. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed.(JacquelineMata, 4)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul and U.S. Attorney. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JacquelineMata, 4)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement)(Andrews, James)
July 20, 2020 Summons Not Issued as to Andrew Saul as no proposed summons received. Attorney for Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Theresa A Longoria. (Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis granted by the Honorable Andrew S. Hanen 7/17/2020)(jdav, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longoria v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pelham Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan K. Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa A Longoria
Represented By: James Foster Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?