Anderson v. Commissioner Of Social Security
Plaintiff: Liza Marie Anderson
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Case Number: 4:2020cv02551
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN of Service Executed as to U. S. Attorney General on 8/17/20 re: Summons and Complaint, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Commissioner Of Social Security served on 8/17/2020, answer due 10/16/2020, filed.(jtabares, 1)
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 RETURN of Service Executed as to The United States Attorney for the Southern District of Texas on 7/27/2020 re: Summons and Complaint, filed.(BeverlyWright, 4)
July 20, 2020 Summons Issued as to Commissioner Of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Copy of complaint, issued summons, IFP order and USM 285 forwarded to the USM for service., filed.(jdav, 4)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner Of Social Security filed by Liza Marie Anderson. (Application to proceed In Forma Pauperis granted July 17, 2020 by the Honorable Andrew S. Hanen) (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet)(jdav, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Commissioner Of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liza Marie Anderson
Represented By: Melissa Ann Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?