Babineaux v. Houston Independent School District
Plaintiff: Shaun Lee Babineaux
Defendant: Jermani Justice, Alpha Kappa Alpha, Sorority, Incorporated International Headquarters, Kathy Blueford-Daniels, Dr. Doris Delaney, Daniela "Dani&quot Hernandez, Holly Maria Flynn Vilaseca, Tonnis A Hilliard, Julia Dimmitt, Claudia Hernandez, Dr. Grenita Lathan, Dr. Kenneth Davis, Wanda Adams, Judith Cruz, Anne Sung, Houston Independent School District, Rick Cruz, Lisa Sullivan, Abigail Taylor, Patricia K Allen, Melinda Southan-Martin, Sue Deigaard, Lynn Castela, Jermani Morris, A.J. Crabill, Dr. Dawn Dubose-Randle, Kristy Dobson and Elizabeth Santos
Case Number: 4:2020cv02705
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 88 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun Lee Babineaux re: #40 MOTION for Entry of Default against Melinda Southan-Martin, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 9, 2020 Filing 87 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun Lee Babineaux re: #39 MOTION for Entry of Default against Alpha Kappa Alpha, Sorority, Incorporated International Headquarters, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 9, 2020 Filing 86 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun Lee Babineaux re: #52 MOTION for Entry of Default against Judith Cruz, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 9, 2020 Filing 85 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun Lee Babineaux re: #51 MOTION for Entry of Default against Wanda Adams, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 9, 2020 Filing 84 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun Lee Babineaux re: #50 MOTION for Entry of Default against Sue Deigaard, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 9, 2020 Filing 83 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun Lee Babineaux re: #49 MOTION for Entry of Default against Elizabeth Santos, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 9, 2020 Filing 82 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun Lee Babineaux re: #62 MOTION for Entry of Default against Daniela "Dani" Hernandez, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 9, 2020 Filing 81 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun Lee Babineaux re: #61 MOTION for Entry of Default against Patricia K Allen, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 9, 2020 Filing 80 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun Lee Babineaux re: #60 MOTION for Entry of Default against Kathy Blueford-Daniels, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 9, 2020 Filing 79 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun Lee Babineaux re: #59 MOTION for Entry of Default against Holly Maria Flynn Vilaseca, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 9, 2020 Filing 78 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun Lee Babineaux re: #58 MOTION for Entry of Default against Anne Sung, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 9, 2020 Filing 77 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun Lee Babineaux re: #57 MOTION for Entry of Default against A.J. Crabill, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 9, 2020 Filing 76 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun Lee Babineaux re: #56 MOTION for Entry of Default against Doris Delaney, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 9, 2020 Filing 75 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun Lee Babineaux re: #54 MOTION for Entry of Default against Kenneth Davis, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 9, 2020 Filing 74 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun Lee Babineaux re: #55 MOTION for Entry of Default against Lynn Castela, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 9, 2020 Filing 73 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun Lee Babineaux re: #53 MOTION for Entry of Default against Rick Cruz, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 9, 2020 Filing 72 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun Lee Babineaux re: #48 MOTION for Entry of Default against Grenita Lathan, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 9, 2020 Filing 71 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun Lee Babineaux re: #47 MOTION for Entry of Default against Julia Dimmitt, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 9, 2020 Filing 70 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun Lee Babineaux re: #46 MOTION for Entry of Default against Abigail Taylor, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 9, 2020 Filing 69 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun Lee Babineaux re: #45 MOTION for Entry of Default against Claudia Hernandez, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 9, 2020 Filing 68 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun Lee Babineaux re: #44 MOTION for Entry of Default against Tonnis A Hilliard, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 9, 2020 Filing 67 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun Lee Babineaux re: #42 MOTION for Entry of Default against Jermani Justice, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 9, 2020 Filing 66 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun Lee Babineaux re: #41 MOTION for Entry of Default against Dawn Dubose-Randle, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 9, 2020 Filing 65 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun Lee Babineaux re: #43 MOTION for Entry of Default against Lisa Sullivan, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 9, 2020 Filing 64 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun Lee Babineaux re: #37 MOTION for Entry of Default against Kristy Dobson, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 9, 2020 Filing 63 AFFIDAVIT of Shaun Lee Banineaux re: #38 MOTION for Entry of Default against Houston Independent School District, filed.(sguevara, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION for Entry of Default against Daniela "Dani" Hernandez by Shaun Lee Babineaux, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (sguevara, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION for Entry of Default against Patricia K Allen by Shaun Lee Babineaux, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (sguevara, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION for Entry of Default against Kathy Blueford-Daniels by Shaun Lee Babineaux, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (sguevara, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION for Entry of Default against Holly Maria Flynn Vilaseca by Shaun Lee Babineaux, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (sguevara, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION for Entry of Default against Anne Sung by Shaun Lee Babineaux, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (sguevara, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION for Entry of Default against A.J. Crabill by Shaun Lee Babineaux, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (sguevara, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION for Entry of Default against Doris Delaney by Shaun Lee Babineaux, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (sguevara, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for Entry of Default against Lynn Castela by Shaun Lee Babineaux, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (sguevara, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION for Entry of Default against Kenneth Davis by Shaun Lee Babineaux, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (sguevara, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION for Entry of Default against Rick Cruz by Shaun Lee Babineaux, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (sguevara, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION for Entry of Default against Judith Cruz by Shaun Lee Babineaux, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (sguevara, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION for Entry of Default against Wanda Adams by Shaun Lee Babineaux, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (sguevara, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION for Entry of Default against Sue Deigaard by Shaun Lee Babineaux, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (sguevara, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for Entry of Default against Elizabeth Santos by Shaun Lee Babineaux, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (sguevara, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION for Entry of Default against Grenita Lathan by Shaun Lee Babineaux, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (sguevara, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION for Entry of Default against Julia Dimmitt by Shaun Lee Babineaux, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (sguevara, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for Entry of Default against Abigail Taylor by Shaun Lee Babineaux, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (sguevara, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for Entry of Default against Claudia Hernandez by Shaun Lee Babineaux, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (sguevara, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION for Entry of Default against Tonnis A Hilliard by Shaun Lee Babineaux, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (sguevara, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for Entry of Default against Lisa Sullivan by Shaun Lee Babineaux, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (sguevara, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for Entry of Default against Jermani Justice by Shaun Lee Babineaux, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (sguevara, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for Entry of Default against Dawn Dubose-Randle by Shaun Lee Babineaux, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (sguevara, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Entry of Default against Melinda Southan-Martin by Shaun Lee Babineaux, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (sguevara, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION for Entry of Default against Alpha Kappa Alpha, Sorority, Incorporated International Headquarters by Shaun Lee Babineaux, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (sguevara, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Entry of Default against Houston Independent School District by Shaun Lee Babineaux, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (sguevara, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Entry of Default against Kristy Dobson by Shaun Lee Babineaux, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (sguevara, 4)
August 13, 2020 Filing 36 NON-CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Shaun Lee Babineaux, filed.(sguevara, 4)
August 13, 2020 Filing 35 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Wanda Adams served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 13, 2020 Filing 34 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Tonnis A Hilliard served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 13, 2020 Filing 33 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Sue Deigaard served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 13, 2020 Filing 32 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Rick Cruz served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 13, 2020 Filing 31 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Patricia K Allen served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 13, 2020 Filing 30 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Melinda Southan-Martin served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 13, 2020 Filing 29 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Lynn Castela served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 13, 2020 Filing 28 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Lisa Sullivan served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 13, 2020 Filing 27 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Kristy Dobson served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 13, 2020 Filing 26 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Kathy Blueford-Daniels served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 13, 2020 Filing 25 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Julia Dimmitt served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 13, 2020 Filing 24 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Judith Cruz served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 13, 2020 Filing 23 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Jermani Justice served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 13, 2020 Filing 22 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Holly Maria Flynn Vilaseca served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 13, 2020 Filing 21 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Houston Independent School District served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 13, 2020 Filing 20 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Elizabeth Santos served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 13, 2020 Filing 19 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Kenneth Davis served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 13, 2020 Filing 18 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Grenita Lathan served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 13, 2020 Filing 17 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Doris Delaney served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 13, 2020 Filing 16 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Dawn Dubose-Randle served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 13, 2020 Filing 15 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Daniela "Dani" Hernandez served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 13, 2020 Filing 14 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Claudia Hernandez served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 13, 2020 Filing 13 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Anne Sung served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Alpha Kappa Alpha, Sorority, Incorporated International Headquarters served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to A.J. Crabill served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Abigail Taylor served on 8/12/2020, answer due 9/2/2020, filed.(jtabares, 1)
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Kenneth Davis, Doris Delaney, Elizabeth Santos. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation)(mmapps, 4)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Wanda Adams, Lynn Castela, Sue Deigaard, Tonnis A Hilliard, Lisa Sullivan. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 summon, #2 summon, #3 summon, #4 summon)(hlerma, 4)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Patricia K Allen, Kathy Blueford-Daniels, Judith Cruz, Rick Cruz, Kristy Dobson, Dawn Dubose-Randle, Melinda Southan-Martin. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon, #3 Summon, #4 Summon, #5 Summon, #6 Summon)(hlerma, 4)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Judith Cruz, Julia Dimmitt, Daniela "Dani" Hernandez, Houston Independent School District, Jermani Justice, Abigail Taylor, Holly Maria Flynn Vilaseca. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 summon, #2 summon, #3 summon, #4 summon, #5 summon, #6 summon)(hlerma, 4)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Alpha Kappa Alpha, Sorority, Incorporated International Headquarters, A.J. Crabill, Doris Delaney, Claudia Hernandez, Grenita Lathan, Anne Sung. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 summon, #2 summon, #3 summon, #4 summon, #5 summon)(hlerma, 4)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (jdav, 4)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Clerk's Note: This entry made in error. ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/4/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(jdavadi, 4)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(jdavadi, 4)
August 3, 2020 Filing fee: $400.00 re: #1 Complaint, receipt number HOU096814, filed. (jdav, 4)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Shaun Lee Babineaux.(jdav, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Babineaux v. Houston Independent School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jermani Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Kappa Alpha, Sorority, Incorporated International Headquarters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Blueford-Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Doris Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniela "Dani&quot Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Maria Flynn Vilaseca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonnis A Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Dimmitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Grenita Lathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Kenneth Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Sung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Independent School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abigail Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia K Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda Southan-Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Deigaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Castela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jermani Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.J. Crabill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Dawn Dubose-Randle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristy Dobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Lee Babineaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?