University of Saint Thomas v. American Home Assurance Company
Plaintiff: University of Saint Thomas
Defendant: American Home Assurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv02809
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION re: Extend Time to Answer, Move or Respond by American Home Assurance Company, filed.(Ballard, Glenn)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by University of Saint Thomas, filed.(Fogler, Murray)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to American Home Assurance Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShadiaNash, 4)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to American Home Assurance Company, filed.(Fogler, Murray)
August 13, 2020 Summons Not Issued as to American Home Assurance Company due to these deficiencies: Name/Address of Plaintiff Attorney or Plaintiff not present. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed.(ChristopherSarrat, 4)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 12/18/2020 (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(DawnWaggoneradi, 4)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robin O'Neil on behalf of University of Saint Thomas, filed. (O'Neil, Robin)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jas Brar on behalf of University of Saint Thomas, filed. (Brar, Jas)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to American Home Assurance Company, filed.(Fogler, Murray)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Home Assurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25051103) filed by University of Saint Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fogler, Murray)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: University of Saint Thomas v. American Home Assurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University of Saint Thomas
Represented By: Jas Brar
Represented By: Murray J Fogler
Represented By: Robin Finney O'Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Assurance Company
Represented By: Glenn A Ballard, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?