The Guarantee Company of North America USA v. Le-Shun Development, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Defendant: Le-Shun Development, Inc., Ousley L Lacy and Barbara C Lacy
Case Number: 4:2020cv02830
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Barbara C Lacy, Ousley L Lacy, Le-Shun Development, Inc., filed.(Simmons, Richard)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Barbara C Lacy, Ousley L Lacy, Le-Shun Development, Inc., filed.(Simmons, Richard)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Guarantee Company of North America USA, filed.(Weinstein, Gregory)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 12/18/2020(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(JacquelineMata, 4)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 O. Lacy, #2 B. Lacy)(Weinstein, Gregory)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 **DOCKETED IN ERROR* ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 12/18/2021 (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(JacquelineMataadi, 4) Modified on 8/24/2020 (JacquelineMata, 4).
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ShadiaNash, 4)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons- B. Lacy, #2 Summons O. Lacy)(Weinstein, Gregory)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25059642) filed by The Guarantee Company of North America USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weinstein, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Guarantee Company of North America USA v. Le-Shun Development, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Represented By: Gregory M Weinstein
Represented By: Jacob L McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Le-Shun Development, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Allen Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ousley L Lacy
Represented By: Richard Allen Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara C Lacy
Represented By: Richard Allen Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?