Juul Labs, Inc. v. Zitah Services LLC
Plaintiff: Juul Labs, Inc.
Defendant: Zitah Services LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv02850
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL on #8 Notice of Dismissal. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Case terminated on 9/15/2020. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Zitah Services LLC by Juul Labs, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Santillan, Tanya)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Zitah Services LLC served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020, filed.(Chambers, Bradley)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Juul Labs, Inc., filed.(Santillan, Tanya)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Zitah Services LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JacquelineMata, 4)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Zitah Services LLC, filed.(Chambers, Bradley)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ChristopherSarratadi, 4)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/4/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zitah Services LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25065396) filed by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chambers, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juul Labs, Inc. v. Zitah Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zitah Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juul Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley E Chambers
Represented By: Tanya Maria Santillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?