Arig, Inc. v. Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Trustee of Stanwich Mortgage Loan Trust F et al
Plaintiff: Arig, Inc.
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Trustee of Stanwich Mortgage Loan Trust F, JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, SecurityNational Mortgage Company, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv02857
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Filing 32 REPLY in Support of #21 MOTION to Dismiss #12 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., , filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Trustee of Stanwich Mortgage Loan Trust F. (McKleroy, Michael)
October 12, 2020 Filing 31 SEALED EXHIBITS re: #25 Response in Opposition to Motion by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Trustee of Stanwich Mortgage Loan Trust F, filed. (McKleroy, Michael)
October 12, 2020 Filing 30 REPLY in Support of #23 MOTION to Dismiss #12 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., , filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Hytken, Rachel)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #26 . (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Seal Exhibit to Remand Response. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
October 7, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition to #21 MOTION to Dismiss #12 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., , #23 MOTION to Dismiss #12 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., , filed by Arig, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Rule 12(B)(6) Dismissal Motion)(Jackson, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2020 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit to Remand Response, MOTION for Protective Order( Motion Docket Date 10/23/2020.) by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Trustee of Stanwich Mortgage Loan Trust F, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order)(McKleroy, Michael)
October 2, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition to #18 MOTION to Remand, filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Trustee of Stanwich Mortgage Loan Trust F. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McKleroy, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY in Support of #18 MOTION to Remand, filed by Arig, Inc.. (Jackson, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss #12 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hytken, Rachel)
September 23, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition to #10 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Arig, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Rule 12(c) Dismissal Motion)(Jackson, Jeffrey)
September 22, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss #12 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Trustee of Stanwich Mortgage Loan Trust F, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(McKleroy, Michael)
September 21, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition to #18 MOTION to Remand, filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hytken, Rachel)
September 16, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Hytken, Rachel)
September 14, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand by Arig, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/5/2020. (Jackson, Jeffrey)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Seal Removal Notice. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
September 11, 2020 Filing 16 SEALED DOCUMENT Supplement to Notice of Removal by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., filed. (Hytken, Rachel)
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Removal Notice by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McKleroy, Michael)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE granting #13 Notice of Partial Dismissal with prejudice against Defendant Security National Mortgage Company. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified. (bthomas, 4)
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Partial Dismissal with Prejudice by Arig, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Partial Dismissal With Prejudice)(Jackson, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Arig, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Jackson, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition to #6 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Arig, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Jackson, Jeffrey)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Trustee of Stanwich Mortgage Loan Trust F, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(McKleroy, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Trustee of Stanwich Mortgage Loan Trust F, filed.(McKleroy, Michael)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal by SecurityNational Mortgage Company, filed.(King, James)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 Lis Pendens by Arig, Inc., filed.(Jackson, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hytken, Rachel)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Arig, Inc., filed.(Jackson, Jeffrey)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/11/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C. Jackson on behalf of Arig, Inc., filed. (Jackson, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., filed.(Hytken, Rachel)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 234th District Court, Harris Co., TX, case number 2020-41160 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25067516) filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Lewis, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arig, Inc. v. Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Trustee of Stanwich Mortgage Loan Trust F et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Trustee of Stanwich Mortgage Loan Trust F
Represented By: Michael J McKleroy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: William Lance Lewis
Represented By: Rachel L Hytken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SecurityNational Mortgage Company
Represented By: James W King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: William Lance Lewis
Represented By: Rachel L Hytken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Michael J McKleroy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arig, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Craig Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?