Kingstown Capital Management, L.P. et al v. David Dickson et al
Plaintiff: Kingstown Capital Management, L.P., Kingfishers, LP, Ktown, LP, Kingstown Capital Partners LLC, Kingstown 1740 Fund LP, Kingstown Partners II, L.P. and Kingstown Partners Master Ltd.
Defendant: David Dickson, Stuart Spence and McDermott International, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv02880
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Sigmund S. Wisner-Gross to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
September 26, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Sigmund S. Wissner-Gross to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kingfishers, LP, Kingstown 1740 Fund LP, Kingstown Capital Management, L.P., Kingstown Capital Partners LLC, Kingstown Partners II, L.P., Kingstown Partners Master Ltd., Ktown, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/19/2020. (Hedrick, Joshua)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION re: Setting Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Kingfishers, LP, Kingstown 1740 Fund LP, Kingstown Capital Management, L.P., Kingstown Capital Partners LLC, Kingstown Partners II, L.P., Kingstown Partners Master Ltd., Ktown, LP, filed.(Hedrick, Joshua)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Kingstown 1740 Fund LP, Kingstown Partners II, L.P., Kingstown Capital Partners LLC, Kingstown Partners Master Ltd., Kingstown Capital Management, L.P., Ktown, LP, Kingfishers, LP.(Hedrick, Joshua)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kingfishers, LP, Kingstown 1740 Fund LP, Kingstown Capital Management, L.P., Kingstown Capital Partners LLC, Kingstown Partners II, L.P., Kingstown Partners Master Ltd., Ktown, LP, filed.(Hedrick, Joshua)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Stuart Spence served on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020, filed.(Hedrick, Joshua)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to David Dickson served on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020, filed.(Hedrick, Joshua)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION to Reassign Case by Kingfishers, LP, Kingstown 1740 Fund LP, Kingstown Capital Management, L.P., Kingstown Capital Partners LLC, Kingstown Partners II, L.P., Kingstown Partners Master Ltd., Ktown, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hedrick, Joshua)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/4/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ShadiaNashadi, 4)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Dickson, Stuart Spence (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25073060) filed by Kingstown 1740 Fund LP, Ktown, LP, Kingstown Capital Management, L.P., Kingstown Partners II, L.P., Kingstown Capital Partners LLC, Kingstown Partners Master Ltd., Kingfishers, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hedrick, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kingstown Capital Management, L.P. et al v. David Dickson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kingstown Capital Management, L.P.
Represented By: Joshua Lynn Hedrick
Represented By: Sigmund S Wissner-Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kingfishers, LP
Represented By: Joshua Lynn Hedrick
Represented By: Sigmund S Wissner-Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ktown, LP
Represented By: Joshua Lynn Hedrick
Represented By: Sigmund S Wissner-Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kingstown Capital Partners LLC
Represented By: Joshua Lynn Hedrick
Represented By: Sigmund S Wissner-Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kingstown 1740 Fund LP
Represented By: Joshua Lynn Hedrick
Represented By: Sigmund S Wissner-Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kingstown Partners II, L.P.
Represented By: Joshua Lynn Hedrick
Represented By: Sigmund S Wissner-Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kingstown Partners Master Ltd.
Represented By: Joshua Lynn Hedrick
Represented By: Sigmund S Wissner-Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDermott International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?