St. Julian v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Janice St. Julian
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv02886
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, filed.(Wills, Linda)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, filed.(Wills, Linda)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Answer or Other Response due by 10/6/2020.) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Janice St. Julian, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Wills, Linda)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/4/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(ShadiaNashadi, 4)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ChristopherSarrat, 4)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Janice St. Julian, filed.(Vessel, John)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, filed.(Vessel, John)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25074287) filed by Janice St. Julian. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vessel, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Julian v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Linda P Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice St. Julian
Represented By: John Anthony Vessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?