Flores v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Celia Leticia Flores
Defendant: Wallace L. Carroll, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli and Chad F. Wolf
Case Number: 4:2020cv02887
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney Ryan K. Patrick. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JosephWells, 4)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Celia Leticia Flores, filed.(Gonzalez, Raed)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Wallace L. Carroll, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Chad F. Wolf, U.S. Attorney Ryan K. Patrick, filed.(Gonzalez, Raed)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and U.S. Attorney General, Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(ShadiaNash, 4) Duplicate Summons filed for William Barr, no summons issued for U.S. Attorney Ryan K. Patrick. Modified on 8/20/2020 (ShadiaNash, 4).
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, Attorney General of the United States William P. Barr , filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation Summons 2, #2 Continuation Summons 3, #3 Continuation Summons 4, #4 Continuation Summons 5)(Gonzalez, Raed) Modified on 8/20/2020 (ShadiaNash, 4). Duplicate Summons filed for William Barr, no summons included for U.S. Attorney Ryan K. Patrick.
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ShadiaNashadi, 4)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25074792) filed by Celia Leticia Flores. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-12)(Gonzalez, Raed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace L. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celia Leticia Flores
Represented By: Raed Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?