Ramey & Schwaller, LLP v. Zions Bancorporation, N.A.
Plaintiff: Ramey & Schwaller, LLP
Defendant: Zions Bancorporation, N.A. d/b/a Amegy Bank and Zions Bancorporation, N.A. doing business as Amegy Bank
Case Number: 4:2020cv02890
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Ramey & Schwaller, LLPs Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Defendants Counterclaim by Ramey & Schwaller, LLP, filed.(Meade, Andrew)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ramey & Schwaller, LLP filed by Ramey & Schwaller, LLP.(Meade, Andrew)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William P. Ramey, III on behalf of Ramey & Schwaller, LLP, filed. (Ramey, William)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #3 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. and Counterclaim, filed by Zions Bancorporation, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wilde, Carlton)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Zions Bancorporation, N.A., filed.(Wilde, Carlton)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ramey & Schwaller, LLP, filed.(Barnes, Holly)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Zions Bancorporation, N.A. filed by Ramey & Schwaller, LLP.(Barnes, Holly)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/11/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(ShadiaNashadi, 4)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, case number 2020-48831 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25075193) filed by Zions Bancorporation, N.A. d/b/a Amegy Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit State Court Petition)(Wilde, Carlton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramey & Schwaller, LLP v. Zions Bancorporation, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramey & Schwaller, LLP
Represented By: Andrew K Meade
Represented By: Kelly D Stephens
Represented By: Holly Henderson Barnes
Represented By: William P Ramey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zions Bancorporation, N.A. d/b/a Amegy Bank
Represented By: Carlton Dalbey Wilde, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zions Bancorporation, N.A. doing business as Amegy Bank
Represented By: Carlton Dalbey Wilde, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?