Jolivette v. Hidalgo et al
Plaintiff: Eric Jolivette, Richard Derwin Howard, Darrell Wayne Watson, Kenneth Wayne Harper, Edward James Gipson, Leamon Dewayne O'Bryant, Martin Hernandez and Joey Harper
Defendant: Lina Hidalgo, Administrators of Harris County and its Agents Thereof and Ed Gonzalez
Case Number: 4:2020cv02908
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Charles Eskridge
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Remailed Notice (DKT #5) to Edward Gipson. Re-mailed through our noticing center on October 8, 2020. (bgoolsby, 4)
October 5, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of Address by Eric Jolivette, filed. (scastillo, 1)
September 24, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Martin Hernandez, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/15/2020. (BrendaLacy, 4)
September 24, 2020 Filing 14 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Richard Derwin Howard, filed. (jdav, 4)
September 23, 2020 Filing 13 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Joey Harper, filed. (MelissaMorgan, 4)
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Joey Harper, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/14/2020. (MelissaMorgan, 4)
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Kenneth Wayne Harper, filed. (CarrieDickie, 6)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Kenneth Wayne Harper, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/13/2020. (CarrieDickie, 6)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Richard Derwin Howard, filed. (ckrus, 4)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Richard Derwin Howard, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/5/2020. (ckrus, 4)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Edward James Gipson re: #5 Notice of Deficient Pleading (FORM),, filed. (scastillo, 1)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Edward James Gipson, filed. (jtabares, 1)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING as to Edward James Gipson, Joey Harper, Kenneth Wayne Harper, Martin Hernandez, Richard Derwin Howard, Leamon Dewayne O'Bryant, Darrell Wayne Watson. Parties notified Notice of Compliance due by 9/24/2020, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (bgoolsby, 4)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (bmendoza, 5)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Court To Appointment of Counsel by Eric Jolivette, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2020. (bmendoza, 5)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Adminstrators's of Harris County and its Agentsd thereof, Ed Gonzalez, Lina Hidalgo (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Eric Jolivette.(bmendoza, 5)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jolivette v. Hidalgo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Jolivette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Derwin Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Wayne Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward James Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leamon Dewayne O'Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lina Hidalgo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrators of Harris County and its Agents Thereof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?