Sue M. Hanks v. Cox Radio Inc.
Plaintiff: Sue M. Hanks
Defendant: Cox Radio Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv03046
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice. Case terminated on 6/21/2021. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
June 21, 2021 Filing 23 Joint MOTION to Dismiss - Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Cox Radio Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffer, Rachel)
April 30, 2021 Filing 22 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by Cox Radio Inc., filed.(Shardonofsky, Esteban)
March 31, 2021 Filing 21 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by Sue M. Hanks, filed.(Van Huff, Albert)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AGREE CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER - granting #19 Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Agreed Confidentiality Order. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
January 8, 2021 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Agreed Confidentiality Order by Cox Radio Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Shardonofsky, Esteban)
November 11, 2020 initial conference is cancelled. Parties have submitted an agreed proposed scheduling order. (arrivera, 4)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING/DOCKETING CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 1/15/2021 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 4/1/2021. Pltf Expert Report due by 4/1/2021. Deft Expert Witness List due by 6/3/2021. Deft Expert Report due by 6/3/2021. Discovery due by 8/31/2021. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 8/2/2021. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 8/2/2021. Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/25/2021. Trial set for 11/1/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
November 4, 2020 Filing 17 Notice Regarding Initial Conference(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
November 3, 2020 Filing 16 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Cox Radio Inc., filed.(Hoffer, Rachel)
October 23, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Cox Radio Inc., filed.(Shardonofsky, Esteban)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Substitute Counsel and Notice of Appearance. It is ORDERED that Rachel M. Hoffer is entered as an attorney of record for Defendant in this case and Oluwafunmito P. Seton is hereby terminated as counsel in this case.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
October 20, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Substitute Counsel and Notice of Appearance by Cox Radio Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffer, Rachel)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Cox Radio Inc. 10/23/2020.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Cox Radio Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shardonofsky, Esteban)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Sue M. Hanks, filed.(Van Huff, Albert)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cox Radio Inc. filed by Sue M. Hanks.(Van Huff, Albert)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs FirstAmended Complaint. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Sue M. Hanks, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave, #2 Complaint Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Van Huff, Albert)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cox Radio Inc., filed.(Shardonofsky, Esteban)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sue M. Hanks, filed.(Van Huff, Albert)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Charles Eskridge recused. Case reassigned to Judge Keith P Ellison for all further proceedings.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cox Radio Inc., filed.(Shardonofsky, Esteban)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 215th, case number C-2020-46254 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25138416) filed by Cox Radio Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Shardonofsky, Esteban)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sue M. Hanks v. Cox Radio Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue M. Hanks
Represented By: Morgan Kay Abels
Represented By: Anna Celeste Widner
Represented By: Albert Thomas Van Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Radio Inc.
Represented By: Esteban Shardonofsky
Represented By: Oluwafunmito P Seton
Represented By: Rachel Megan Hoffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?