Lancaster v. Carnival Corporation
Plaintiff: Gary Lancaster
Defendant: Carnival Corporation and Carnival Corporation doing business as Carnival Cruise Line
Case Number: 4:2020cv03122
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Carnival Corporation served on 9/10/2020, answer due 11/9/2020, filed.(Clearman, Scott)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 12/7/2020 at 10:30 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(JacquelineMataadi, 4)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet by Gary Lancaster, filed.(Clearman, Scott)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carnival Corporation (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25165308) filed by Gary Lancaster.(Clearman, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lancaster v. Carnival Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation doing business as Carnival Cruise Line
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Lancaster
Represented By: Scott Monroe Clearman
Represented By: Ana E Kadala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?