World Equity Group, Inc. v. Victoria Midstream LLC
Plaintiff: World Equity Group, Inc.
Defendant: Victoria Midstream LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv03230
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Victoria Midstream LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JacquelineMata, 4)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Victoria Midstream LLC, filed.(Oppel, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by World Equity Group, Inc., filed.(Oppel, Jeffrey)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/1/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ShadiaNashadi, 4)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Victoria Midstream LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JosephWells, 4)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Victoria Midstream LLC, filed.(Oppel, Jeffrey)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Victoria Midstream LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25216317) filed by World Equity Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oppel, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: World Equity Group, Inc. v. Victoria Midstream LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: World Equity Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Wells Oppel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Midstream LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?