United States of America v. $90,150.00
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $90,150.00 in U.S. Currency, $73,474.00 in U.S. Currency, and $22,400.00 in U.S. Currency, Anthony L Hutchison and $90,150.00
Claimant: Brian Busby
Case Number: 4:2020cv03256
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 0981 Forfeiture in Rem
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #19 Hutchinson's motion to dismiss, denying in part #29 Busby's motion to dismiss, and granting #30 Government's motion to stay this case.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
January 4, 2022 Filing 30 Opposed MOTION to Stay (Amended Second Motion to Extend Stay) by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rollinson, Kristine)
January 3, 2022 Filing 29 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss #8 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., #1 Complaint by Brian Busby, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(White, Mark)
December 17, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Resetting as to #22 Opposed MOTION to Stay (Second Motion to Extend Stay). Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen, filed. (rhawkins)
December 10, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Resetting as to #22 Opposed MOTION to Stay (Second Motion to Extend Stay). Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen, filed. (rhawkins)
November 24, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Resetting as to #22 Opposed Motion to Stay (Second Motion to Extend Stay). Notice of Setting. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen, filed. (jdav, 4)
November 19, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Setting as to #22 Opposed MOTION to Stay (Second Motion to Extend Stay). Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen, filed. (rhawkins)
September 14, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition to #22 Opposed MOTION to Stay (Second Motion to Extend Stay), filed by Anthony L Hutchison. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(MacVane, John)
September 11, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition to #22 Opposed MOTION to Stay (Second Motion to Extend Stay), filed by Brian Busby. (White, Mark)
August 24, 2021 Filing 22 Opposed MOTION to Stay (Second Motion to Extend Stay) by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rollinson, Kristine)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Extend Stay. Stay is continued from any further activity for 90 days from the date of this order. The parties are advised that no further stays of this nature will be granted, absent extraordinary circumstances..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
May 25, 2021 Filing 20 Opposed RESPONSE in Opposition to #17 Opposed MOTION to Extend Stay of Civil Forfeiture Case, filed by Brian Busby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" FBI Affidavit for Search Warrants)(White, Mark)
May 17, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Anthony L Hutchison, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(MacVane, John)
May 14, 2021 Filing 18 SEALED DOCUMENT by United States of America, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Rollinson, Kristine)
May 14, 2021 Filing 17 Opposed MOTION to Extend Stay of Civil Forfeiture Case by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rollinson, Kristine)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying without prejudice #3 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part #13 Motion to Stay.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
January 8, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition to #13 MOTION to Stay Civil Forfeiture Case and Quash Subpoena, filed by Anthony L Hutchison. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(MacVane, John)
December 18, 2020 Filing 14 SEALED EXHIBITS re: #13 MOTION to Stay Civil Forfeiture Case and Quash Subpoena by United States of America, filed. (Rollinson, Kristine)
December 18, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay Civil Forfeiture Case and Quash Subpoena by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rollinson, Kristine)
November 11, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY in Support of #3 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint , filed by Anthony L Hutchison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Government's Extension Motion)(MacVane, John)
November 11, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Brian Busby, filed. (White, Mark)
November 4, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rollinson, Kristine)
October 29, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of Service on 10/29/2020 re: Warrant of Arrest in Rem, filed.(jdav, 4)
October 28, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against $90,150.00 filed by United States of America.(Rollinson, Kristine)
October 26, 2020 Warrant of Arrest in REM issued, filed.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
October 23, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States of America, filed.(Rollinson, Kristine)
October 23, 2020 Filing 6 Warrant of Arrest in Rem by United States of America, filed.(Rollinson, Kristine)
October 20, 2020 Filing 5 CLAIM for $90,150.00 filed by Brian Busby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DeGuerin, Dick)
October 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Dick DeGuerin and Mark White on behalf of Brian Busby, filed. (DeGuerin, Dick)
October 15, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Anthony L Hutchison, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(MacVane, John)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Claim by Anthony L Hutchison, filed. (MacVane, John)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $90,150.00 in U.S. Currency, $73,474.00 in U.S. Currency, and $22,400.00 in U.S. Currency filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Rollinson, Kristine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $90,150.00
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $90,150.00 in U.S. Currency, $73,474.00 in U.S. Currency, and $22,400.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony L Hutchison
Represented By: Russell Hardin, Jr
Represented By: John Garnet MacVane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $90,150.00
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kristine E Rollinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Brian Busby
Represented By: Dick DeGuerin
Represented By: Mark Wells White, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?