Ortiz v. Collier et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Ortiz
Defendant: A. Correll, Oscar Mendoza, Lorie Davis, Warden Robert D. Herrera, Alisha Chiles, Lakisha S. Murphy, Asst. Warden J. C. Gonzales, Brittney M. Tillev, Bryan Collier, Erica V. Hopkins, Tommy Ybarra and M. Lewandowski
Case Number: 4:2020cv03266
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Add Evidence by Anthony Ortiz, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/19/2020. (dnoriega, 1)
October 22, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Anthony Ortiz, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/12/2020. (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4)
October 22, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to prove that the defendants in grievance actions were motivated by evil motive or intent or involved reckless or callous indefference to my constitutional rights by Anthony Ortiz, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 attachment 1, #2 attachment 2, #3 attachment 3, #4 attachment 4, #5 attachment 5, #6 Envelope)(ckrus, 4)
October 19, 2020 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Anthony Ortiz for Entry of Default,filed.(ChristopherSarrat, 4)
October 13, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Anthony Ortiz, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(gkelner, 4)
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Amend #1 Complaint by Anthony Ortiz, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/29/2020. (DawnWaggoner, 4)
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Anthony Ortiz, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/29/2020. (gkelner, 4)
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by Anthony Ortiz, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 exhibits, #2 envelope)(jdav, 4)
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Anthony Ruiz, filed.(ClaudiaGutierrez, 4)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from Anthony Ortiz re: District Judge to try case, filed. (gkelner, 4)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 Supplemental EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Anthony Ortiz, filed.(DawnWaggoner, 4)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Issuance of Summons by Anthony Ortiz, filed.(dnoriega, 1)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (DawnWaggoner, 4)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 The Problem of Three Strikes by Anthony Ortiz, filed.(DawnWaggoner, 4)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Anthony Ortiz, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/7/2020. (DawnWaggoner, 4)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Anthony Ortiz, filed. (DawnWaggoner, 4)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Anthony Ortiz, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/7/2020. (DawnWaggoner, 4)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Anthony Ortiz.(DawnWaggoner, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Collier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Correll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Robert D. Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alisha Chiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakisha S. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asst. Warden J. C. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittney M. Tillev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica V. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Lewandowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?