Lewis v. Collier et al
Plaintiff: Johnny Dewayne Lewis
Defendant: K. Strong and Bryan Collier
Case Number: 4:2020cv03277
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - #5 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis is DENIED, #4 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED as moot. The lawsuit is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Lewis may move to reinstate this case upon payment of the full $400.00 filing fee within 30 days from the date of this dismissal...*** Case terminated on 10/20/20 Email sent to Manager of Three Strikes List. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 Letter/MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Johnny Dewayne Lewis, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/26/2020. (MarcelleLaBee, 4)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Johnny Dewayne Lewis, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/26/2020. (MarcelleLaBee, 4)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Johnny Dewayne Lewis, filed.(ClaudiaGutierrez, 4)
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (bgoolsby, 4)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Bryan Collier, K. Strong (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Johnny Dewayne Lewis.(bgoolsby, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Collier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Dewayne Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?