Moore et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Moore, Jr. and Linda Moore
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust 2004-OPT2, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004 OPT2, PHH Mortgage Corporation and Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Case Number: 4:2020cv03299
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 1/15/2021. Pltf Expert Report due by 3/5/2021. Deft Expert Report due by 5/7/2021. Discovery due by 8/6/2021. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 9/3/2021. Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/1/2021. Docket Call set for 10/8/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION. The Initial Conference set for 10/23/2020 at 2:00 PM is cancelled, filed. (aboyd, 4)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by PHH Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, filed.(Durell, Daniel)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Linda Moore, Thomas Moore, Jr., filed.(Jackson, Jeffrey)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/23/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 Lis Pendens by Linda Moore, Thomas Moore, Jr., filed.(Jackson, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C. Jackson on behalf of Linda Moore, Thomas Moore, Jr., filed. (Jackson, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by PHH Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust 2004-OPT2, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004 OPT2, filed.(Durell, Daniel)
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fort Bend County District Court, case number 20-DCV-275751 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25246708) filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust 2004-OPT2, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004 OPT2. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index of All Matters, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - List of All Counsel, #4 Exhibit D - State Court File, #5 Exhibit E - Fort Bend CAD property information)(Durell, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Moore, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey Craig Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Moore
Represented By: Jeffrey Craig Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee for MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust 2004-OPT2, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004 OPT2
Represented By: Daniel Glenn Durell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Glenn Durell
Represented By: Robert T Mowrey
Represented By: Kurt Lance Krolikowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Daniel Glenn Durell
Represented By: Robert T Mowrey
Represented By: Kurt Lance Krolikowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?