QES Pressure Control LLC v. Zurich American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: QES Pressure Control, LLC
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv03661
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Referring Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Andrew S Hanen. Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (leddins, 4)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RECUSAL ORDER. Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
December 7, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Reassignment. Parties notified, filed. (gkelner, 4)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Nancy F Atlas recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Initial pretrial conference held Appearances: Travis Michael Brown, Alicia G Curran, William Hunter Craven. Ct Reporter: ERO. The parties explained the case in full detail. The Courtdecides that it must recuse from this case.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
November 27, 2020 Filing 27 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER Docket Control Order re: #25 JointDiscovery/Case Management Plan, filed.(Rauch, Amy)
November 27, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 12/1/2020 at 02:00 PM (TIME CHANGE ONLY) in by telephone before Judge Nancy F Atlas, filed. Please contact the Court at 713-250-5290, Conference ID: 45601#, PIN:13579#. (sashabranner, 4)
November 25, 2020 Filing 25 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by QES Pressure Control, LLC, filed.(Rauch, Amy)
November 6, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Zurich American Insurance Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Curran, Alicia)
November 4, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by QES Pressure Control, LLC, filed.(Brown, Travis)
October 28, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Zurich American Insurance Company, filed.(Curran, Alicia)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/1/2020 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(mmapps, 4)
October 26, 2020 Filing 20 Case transferred in from Texas Western. Case Number 4:20-cv-00050; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, Based on the foregoing, the Court OVERRULES Plaintiffs Objections (Doc. 16) and ADOPTS the R&R in its entirety (Doc. 12). The Court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue. (Doc. 7). Specifically, the Court DENIES Defendants Motion to Dismiss and GRANTS Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue for #7 Motion to Dismiss filed by Zurich American Insurance Company, #12 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ab1)
September 22, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE Reply in Support of to #16 Objection to Report and Recommendations by QES Pressure Control LLC. (Rauch, Amy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #16 Objection to Report and Recommendations, #12 Report and Recommendations by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Curran, Alicia)
September 8, 2020 Filing 16 OBJECTION to #12 Report and Recommendations by QES Pressure Control LLC.. (Brown, Travis)
September 2, 2020 Filing 15 Certified Mail Receipt Returned with a Signature of #13 Certified Mailing, #12 Report and Recommendations (ab1)
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 Certified Mail Receipts Returned with signature of #13 Certified Mailing (ab1)
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 Certified Mailing for both parties on the case of #12 Report and Recommendations (ab1)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING AS MOOT #11 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or, Alternatively, Motion to Transfer. The court filed its Report an Recommendation on August 21, 2020. Entered by Judge David B. Fannin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DF)
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the U.S. Magistrate Judge re #7 Motion to Dismiss filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (ab1)
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively Transfer Venue by QES Pressure Control LLC. (Attachments: #1 Sur-Reply, #2 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge David B. Fannin. (Brown, Travis)
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Zurich American Insurance Company, re #7 MOTION to Dismiss FOR IMPROPER VENUE OR, ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE filed by Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit C1, #7 Exhibit C2, #8 Exhibit C3, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit F1, #13 Exhibit F2, #14 Exhibit G1, #15 Exhibit G2, #16 Exhibit G3, #17 Exhibit G4, #18 Exhibit G5, #19 Exhibit G6, #20 Exhibit G7a, #21 Exhibit G7b, #22 Exhibit H)(Curran, Alicia)
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by QES Pressure Control LLC, re #7 MOTION to Dismiss FOR IMPROPER VENUE OR, ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE filed by Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Travis)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 ATTACHMENT PROPOSED ORDER to #7 MOTION to Dismiss FOR IMPROPER VENUE OR, ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Curran, Alicia)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss FOR IMPROPER VENUE OR, ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A). Motions referred to Judge David B. Fannin. (Curran, Alicia)
July 16, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines to file an Answer due 7/23/20 or other Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Zurich American Insurance Company. (ab1)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company shall file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Original Complaint by Thursday, July 23, 2020. Entered by Judge David B. Fannin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bz)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge David B. Fannin. (Curran, Alicia)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Parties by QES Pressure Control LLC. (Brown, Travis)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by QES Pressure Control LLC. Zurich American Insurance Company served on 6/25/2020, answer due 7/16/2020. (Brown, Travis)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Zurich American Insurance Company. (klw)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by QES Pressure Control LLC. on Zurich American Insurance Company (Brown, Travis) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/25/2020) (klw).
June 24, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge David B. Fannin. (ab1)
June 24, 2020 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ab1)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13696715). No Summons requested at this time, filed by QES Pressure Control LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Travis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: QES Pressure Control LLC v. Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QES Pressure Control, LLC
Represented By: Travis Michael Brown
Represented By: J Parker Fauntleroy, Jr
Represented By: Amy Nicole Rauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Alicia G Curran
Represented By: William Hunter Craven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?