The Princeton Excess and Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. A.H.D. Houston, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Princeton Excess and Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Defendant: A.H.D. Houston, Inc. d/b/a Centerfolds, Jennifer Xzharinova, Tiffany Toth, Lucy Pinder, Elizabeth Turner, Lina Posada, Cielo Jean Gibson, Jaclyn Swedberg, Jamillette Gaxiola, Sandra Valencia, D WG FM Inc. d/b/a Splendor, W.L. York, Inc. d/b/a Treasures, D. Texas Investments, Inc. d/b/a Treasures, Jessica Hinton, Cora Skinner, Paola Canas, Emily Sears, A.H.D. Houston, Inc. d/b/a Treasures, Gemma Lee Farrell, Maysa Qui and Jaime Middleton
Case Number: 4:2020cv03680
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by A.H.D. Houston, Inc. d/b/a Centerfolds, A.H.D. Houston, Inc. d/b/a Treasures, D WG FM Inc. d/b/a Splendor, D. Texas Investments, Inc. d/b/a Treasures, W.L. York, Inc. d/b/a Treasures, filed.(Wallace, Casey)
December 2, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by A.H.D. Houston, Inc. d/b/a Centerfolds, D WG FM Inc. d/b/a Splendor, D. Texas Investments, Inc. d/b/a Treasures, W.L. York, Inc. d/b/a Treasures, filed.(Wallace, Casey)
November 20, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to A.H.D. Houston, Inc. d/b/a Centerfolds served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020, filed.(McCall, George)
November 20, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to W.L. York, Inc. d/b/a Treasures served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020, filed.(McCall, George)
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to D. Texas Investments, Inc. d/b/a Treasures served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020, filed.(McCall, George)
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to D WG FM Inc. d/b/a Splendor served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020, filed.(McCall, George)
November 20, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to A.H.D. Houston, Inc. d/b/a Treasures served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020, filed.(McCall, George)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Princeton Excess and Surplus Lines Insurance Company, filed.(McCall, George)
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to A.H.D. Houston, Inc. d/b/a Centerfolds, A.H.D. Houston, Inc. d/b/a Treasures, D WG FM Inc. d/b/a Splendor, D. Texas Investments, Inc. d/b/a Treasures, W.L. York, Inc. d/b/a Treasures. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(mmapps, 4)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/29/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4)
October 27, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to A.H.D. Houston, Inc. d/b/a Centerfolds, A.H.D. Houston, Inc. d/b/a Treasures, D WG FM Inc. d/b/a Splendor, D. Texas Investments, Inc. d/b/a Treasures, W.L. York, Inc. d/b/a Treasures, filed. (Attachments: #1 request for issuance of summons, #2 request for issuance of summons, #3 request for issuance of summons, #4 request for issuance of summons)(McCall, George)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25418329) filed by The Princeton Excess and Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(McCall, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Princeton Excess and Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. A.H.D. Houston, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.H.D. Houston, Inc. d/b/a Centerfolds
Represented By: Casey T Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Xzharinova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucy Pinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lina Posada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cielo Jean Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaclyn Swedberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamillette Gaxiola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Valencia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D WG FM Inc. d/b/a Splendor
Represented By: Casey T Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.L. York, Inc. d/b/a Treasures
Represented By: Casey T Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Texas Investments, Inc. d/b/a Treasures
Represented By: Casey T Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Hinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cora Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paola Canas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.H.D. Houston, Inc. d/b/a Treasures
Represented By: Casey T Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gemma Lee Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maysa Qui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Princeton Excess and Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: George S McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?