Fuller v. Northwest Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram et al
Plaintiff: DeKarla Kyle Fuller
Defendant: Northwest Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram and Chrysler Capital Finance
Case Number: 4:2020cv03686
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. By January 26, 2021, Plaintiff shall either present evidence of service on Defendants or show cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of service. Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 2/25/2021. Initial Conference set for 3/2/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/1/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4)
October 27, 2020 Filing fee: $400 re: #1 Complaint, receipt number HOU098447, filed. (olindor, 4)
October 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (olindor, 4)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by DeKarla Kyle Fuller.(olindor, 4) (Attachment(s): #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (olindor, 4).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuller v. Northwest Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeKarla Kyle Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrysler Capital Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?