Cooper v. FIT Warrior LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Cooper
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FIT Warrior LLC and Tanner Chidester
Case Number: 4:2020cv03704
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 ***Delivery Confirmation for delivery date(s) 12/2/20 by Fed Ex re: 9 Document(s) Sent, filed. (rguerrero, 4)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND UNOPPOSED REQUEST FOR REMAND and ORDERS this matter be remanded to the 333rd Judicial Court of Harris County, Texas for further proceedings under Cause No. 202063647...***Case terminated on 11/30/20. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND UNOPPOSED REQUEST FOR REMAND by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stevens, Gregg)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting Defendant's #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Answer due by 12/4/2020.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stevens, Gregg)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/29/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(DawnWaggoneradi, 4)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed.(Stevens, Gregg)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Stevens, Gregg)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 333rd Judicial District Court, case number 202063647 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25425721) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stevens, Gregg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. FIT Warrior LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Gregg D Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIT Warrior LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanner Chidester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Cooper
Represented By: Shanon Keith Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?