Spencer Ogden, Inc. v. 6Cats International Limited
Plaintiff: Spencer Ogden, Inc.
Defendant: 6Cats International Limited
Case Number: 4:2020cv03705
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Extension ORDER terminating #21 . By 1/18/2021, the parties must move for summary judgment. By 1/29/2021, the parties must respond. Internal review set for 2/1/2021. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
December 15, 2020 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Continuance of Motion Deadline by Spencer Ogden, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martin, Cindy)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER to Move. By 12/21/2020, the parties must move for summary judgment. By 12/31/2020, the parties must respond. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
November 18, 2020 Filing 19 Minute Entry for INITIAL CONFERENCE held before Judge Lynn N Hughes on 11/18/2020. Order to be entered. Internal review set for 1/4/2021. Appearances: Michael Orlando, Darin Brooks, Kristen Kelly. (Court Reporter: G. Dye) (ghassan, 4)
November 16, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. Waters on behalf of 6Cats International Limited, filed. (Waters, Brian)
November 16, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen W. Kelly on behalf of 6Cats International Limited, filed. (Kelly, Kristen)
November 10, 2020 Filing 16 Ex Parte MOTION Enroll Co-Counsel by Spencer Ogden, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martin, Cindy)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order: Initial Conference set for 11/18/2020 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ltien, 4)
October 28, 2020 Filing 13 Case transferred in from Eastern District of Louisiana (New Orleans). Case Number 2:19cv11592. (ltien, 4)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #3 MOTION to Sever Contractual Indemnity Claim, MOTION to Transfer Case to the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Spencer Ogden's claims against 6CATS are hereby SEVERED and TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 10/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Letter) Parties notified. This order was originally entered in EDLA Case No. 2:19cv11592. (ltien, 4)
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 Witness and Exhibit List by 6Cats International Limited. This document was originally filed electronically in EDLA Case No. 2:19cv11592. (ltien, 4)
October 19, 2020 Filing 10 Witness and Exhibit List by Spencer Ogden, Inc. This document was originally filed electronically in EDLA Case No. 2:19cv11592. (ltien, 4)
April 6, 2020 Filing 9 Witness and Exhibit List by 6Cats International Limited. This document was originally filed electronically in EDLA Case No. 2:19cv11592. (ltien, 4)
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 Witness and Exhibit List by Spencer Ogden, Inc. This document was originally filed electronically in EDLA Case No. 2:19cv11592. (ltien, 4)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to #3 MOTION to Sever Contractual Indemnity Claim, MOTION to Transfer Case to the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), filed by 6Cats International Limited. This document was originally filed in EDLA Case No. 2:19cv11592. (ltien, 4)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Sever Cross-Claim and Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) This order was originally entered in EDLA Case No. 2:19cv11592. (ltien, 4)
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Sever Cross-Claim and Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) by 6Cats International Limited, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading) This document was originally filed electronically in EDLA Case No. 2:19cv11592. (ltien, 4)
March 24, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #3 MOTION to Sever Contractual Indemnity Claim MOTION to Transfer Case to the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), filed by Spencer Ogden, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) This document was originally filed electronically in EDLA Case No. 2:19cv11592. (ltien, 4)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Sever Contractual Indemnity Claim, MOTION to Transfer Case to the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by 6Cats International Limited, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Notice of Submission) This document was originally filed electronically in EDLA Case No. 2:19cv11592. (ltien, 4)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Crossclaim by 6Cats International Limited, filed. This document was originally filed electronically in EDLA Case No. 2:19cv11592. (ltien, 4)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 CROSSCLAIM against 6Cats International Limited filed by Spencer Ogden, Inc. This document was originally filed in EDLA Case No. 2:19cv11592. (ltien, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer Ogden, Inc. v. 6Cats International Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6Cats International Limited
Represented By: Darin Lee Brooks
Represented By: Harry Edson Morse
Represented By: Martin Stewart Bohman
Represented By: Kristen W Kelly
Represented By: Brian Edward Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spencer Ogden, Inc.
Represented By: Alfred J Rufty, III
Represented By: Rufus C Harris, III
Represented By: Cindy Galpin Martin
Represented By: Arturo Cuauhtemoc Aguilar
Represented By: Michael Alan Orlando, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?