Hotze et al v. Hollins
Plaintiff: Steven F. Hotze, M.D., Steve Toth, sharon hemphill, Wendell Champion and Hon. Steve Toth
Defendant: Christopher G Hollins, Elizabeth Hernandez for Congress, Jamie Lyn Royer and Chris Hollins
Intervenor Defendant: JENN RAINEY, ALAN MAUK, Yekaterina Snezhkova, Helen Anice Shelton, ELAINE FRANKEL, RUSSELL "RUSTY" HARDIN, DOUGLAS MOLL, RICHARD FRANKEL, Karen Vidor, Michelle Colvard, Diana Untermeyer, BRIAN SINGH, Malkia Hutchinson-Arvizu, JESSICA GOODSPERO, CELIA VESELKA, Glenda Lee Greene, Anton Montano, KIMBERLY PHIPPS-NICHOL, NELSON VANEGAS, SERGIO ALDANA, Andrea Chilton Greer, League of Women Voters of Texas, Mr. Stanley G. Schneider, S. Shawn Stephens, CAREY JORDAN, MARY BACON, RYAN FRANKEL, Jerelyn M Gooden, Jamie Lynn Watson, NYGUEN GRIGGS, AMY ASHMORE, Common Cause Texas, CHRISTINA MASSARA, Elizabeth Furler, Joy Davis-Harasemay, Michelle Royer and Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches
Intervenor: DSCC, David L. Hobbs, Daniel Coleman, Carlton Currie, Jr., MJ for Texas, Mary Currie, Jekaya Simmons, Bettye Hobbs and DCCC
Amicus Curiae: Joseph R. Straus, III, 12 Cities and Counties, The Lincoln Project, Benjamin L. Ginsberg, Election Law Professors, Texas Coalition of Black Democrats and Libertarian Party of Texas
Case Number: 4:2020cv03709
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #55 Notice of Appeal to Daniel C. Osher, Larry R. Veselk, David Keith Isaak, Chris Hollins. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 20-20574), filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
November 5, 2020 Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #55 Notice of Appeal to Theresa J. Lee, Sophia Lin Lakin, Andre Segura, Davin McKay Rosboroug, Dale E. Ho, Marc Erik Elias. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 20-20574), filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1) Modified on 11/5/2020 (JenniferLongoria, 1).
November 5, 2020 Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #55 Notice of Appeal to Andrew Layton Schlafly. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 20-20574), filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
November 4, 2020 *** Access to EROA not granted, no attorney has filed an appearance with the Fifth Circuit, filed. (JenniferLongoria, 1)
November 4, 2020 Electronic record on appeal certified to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals re: #55 Notice of Appeal USCA No. 20-20574, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
November 3, 2020 Filing 66 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #62 Transcript - Appeal, #61 Transcript - Appeal,. Party notified, filed. (jdav, 4)
November 3, 2020 Filing 65 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #55 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal) (JenniferLongoria, 1)
November 3, 2020 Appeal Review Notes re: #55 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid. The appeal filing fee has been paid or an ifp motion has been granted.Hearings were held in the case - transcripts were produced., filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
November 3, 2020 Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 20-20574 re: #55 Notice of Appeal, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Order of USCA re: #55 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 20-20574. ORDERED that appellants motion for injunctive relief to issue a preliminary injunction banning drive-thru voting on Election Day, November 3, 2020, is DENIED, filed.(sanderson, 4)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. This case is closed.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
November 2, 2020 Filing 62 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT re Injunction Hearing held on November 2, 2020 before Judge Andrew S Hanen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathleen Miller. Ordering Party: Andre Segura. This transcript relates to the following: #56 AO435 Transcript Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/1/2021., filed. (kmiller, ) (Main Document 62 replaced on 11/4/2020) (emathis, 4).
November 2, 2020 Filing 61 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT re Ruling of the Court held on November 2, 2020 before Judge Andrew S Hanen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathleen Miller. Ordering Party: Jared R. Woodfill. This transcript relates to the following: #54 Appeal Transcript Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/1/2021., filed. (kmiller, )
November 2, 2020 Filing 60 First MOTION to Modify Order Granting motions to Intervene as to #59 Order by Jerelyn M Gooden, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Barrett, Kenneth)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER. The Court grants motions to intervene #28 #40 #44 and #51 . The Court grants in part and defers in part motions to intervene #5 #16 and #26 . (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
November 2, 2020 Filing 58 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Hollins (Mithoff) for Transcript of Motion Hearing on 11/2/20 before Judge Hanen. Hourly turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathleen Miller, filed. (Mithoff, Richard)
November 2, 2020 Filing 57 Exhibit List by Chris Hollins (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4). The original photos are maintained in the Clerk's office.(rhawkins)
November 2, 2020 Filing 56 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Andre Segura for Transcript of Injunction Hearing on 11/2/2020 before Judge Hanen. Hourly turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathleen Miller, filed. (Segura, Andre)
November 2, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit by Steven F. Hotze, MD (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0541-25449490), filed. (Woodfill, Jared) Modified on 11/3/2020 (JenniferLongoria, 1).
November 2, 2020 Filing 54 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by Hotze. This is to order a transcript of 11/2/20 - Hanen. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathleen Miller. This order form relates to the following: Injunction Hearing,, filed. (Woodfill, Jared)
November 2, 2020 Filing 53 BRIEF On Behalf of Amicus Curiae the Libertarian party of Texas in Support of Defendant by Libertarian Party of Texas, filed.(jdav, 4)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Leave to File Brief oh Behalf of Amicus Curiae the Libertarian Party of Texas in Support of Defendant..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
November 2, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION to Intervene by Stanley G. Schneider, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Schneider, Stanley)
November 2, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to File Brief on Behalf of Amicus Curiae the Libertarian Party of Texas in Support of Defendant by Libertarian Party of Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Brief of LPTexas in Support of Defendant, #2 Proposed Order)(LeBlanc, Jared)
November 2, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for Jessica Scheller to Appear Pro Hac Vice by 12 Cities and Counties, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Witte, Jessica)
November 2, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION for Lauren Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice by 12 Cities and Counties, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Witte, Jessica)
November 2, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION for Victoria Stilwell to Appear Pro Hac Vice by 12 Cities and Counties, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Witte, Jessica)
November 2, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for Jonathan Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice by 12 Cities and Counties, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Witte, Jessica)
November 2, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION to Intervene by Elizabeth Hernandez for Congress, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Ahmad, S)
November 2, 2020 Filing 44 Amended EMERGENCY MOTION by Jerelyn M Gooden, Glenda Lee Greene, S. Shawn Stephens, Michele royer, jamie lyn watson, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Siegel, Charles)
November 2, 2020 Filing 43 BRIEF for Amicus Curiae on Behalf of the Texas Coalition of Black Democrats in Support of Defendant by Texas Coalition of Black Democrats, filed.(jdav, 4)
November 2, 2020 Filing 42 BRIEF in Support of the Defendant by Texas Coalition of Black Democrats, filed.(Cloud, Carvana)
November 2, 2020 Filing 41 BRIEF by Amici Curiae Benjamin L. Ginsberg, Joseph R. Straus, III, In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Emergency Injunctive Relief., filed.(jdav, 4)
November 2, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION to Intervene by David L. Hobbs, Bettye Hobbs, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Hobbs, David)
November 2, 2020 Filing 39 Amended BRIEF in Support of Petitioners' Moton for a Preliminary Injunction re: #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Steven F. Hotze, MD, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Woodfill, Jared)
November 2, 2020 Filing 38 The Lincoln Project Amicus Brief In Support of Defendant by The Lincoln Project, filed.(jdav, 4)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief on Behalf of the Texas Coalition of Black Democrats..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
November 2, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION to Intervene by Jerelyn M Gooden, S. Shawn Stephens, Jamie Lyn Royer, Michele royer, Glenda Lee Greene, jamie lyn watson, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jerelyn Gooden, #2 Exhibit Photo of Gooden leaving polling place, #3 Exhibit Declaration of S. Shawn Stephens, #4 Exhibit DECLARATION OF Glenda Lee Greene, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Michele Royer, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Jamie Lyn Watson)(Barrett, Kenneth)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #24 Motion of the Lincoln Project for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Defendant..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #25 Motion by Benjamin L. Ginsberg and Joseph R. Straus III for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
November 2, 2020 Filing 33 First MOTION for Leave to File to file Amicus Curiae Brief by Texas Coalition of Black Democrats, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cloud, Carvana)
November 2, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Andrea Chilton Greer, Common Cause Texas, Yekaterina Snezhkova, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches. (Cohan, Lindsey)
November 2, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by 12 Cities and Counties, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Witte, Jessica)
November 2, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION Leave to File Amicus Brief by Election Law Professors, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cummings, Sarah)
November 2, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File A WRITTEN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND (2) REQUEST TO PARTICIPATE IN NOVEMBER 2, 2020 HEARING by SERGIO ALDANA, AMY ASHMORE, MARY BACON, ELAINE FRANKEL, RICHARD FRANKEL, RYAN FRANKEL, JESSICA GOODSPERO, NYGUEN GRIGGS, RUSSELL "RUSTY" HARDIN, CAREY JORDAN, CHRISTINA MASSARA, ALAN MAUK, DOUGLAS MOLL, KIMBERLY PHIPPS-NICHOL, JENN RAINEY, BRIAN SINGH, NELSON VANEGAS, CELIA VESELKA, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Veselka, Larry)
November 2, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Intervene by ALAN MAUK, JENN RAINEY, BRIAN SINGH, MARY BACON, KIMBERLY PHIPPS-NICHOL, NYGUEN GRIGGS, NELSON VANEGAS, JESSICA GOODSPERO, AMY ASHMORE, RICHARD FRANKEL, ELAINE FRANKEL, RYAN FRANKEL, CELIA VESELKA, SERGIO ALDANA, RUSSELL "RUSTY" HARDIN, DOUGLAS MOLL, CAREY JORDAN, CHRISTINA MASSARA, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Veselka, Larry)
November 2, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew S Hanen. INJUNCTION HEARING held on 11/2/2020. The Court heard the parties arguments and made rulings on the record. Order to follow. Appearances: Larry Richard Veselka, David Isaak, Jared Ryker Woodfill, Skyler Michelle Howton, Christa Ford, Andre Ivan Segura, Kenneth Royce Barrett, David L. Hobbs, Ryan Nolan, Richard Warren Mithoff, Jr., Joe Alexander, Sherie Beckman, Janie Jordan(Court Reporter: K. Miller), filed.(rhawkins)
November 1, 2020 Filing 27 Amended BRIEF Support re: #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Steven F. Hotze, MD, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Woodfill, Jared)
November 1, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Intervene by League of Women Voters of Texas, Joy Davis-Harasemay, Diana Untermeyer, Michelle Colvard, Karen Vidor, Malkia Hutchinson-Arvizu, Anton Montano, Helen Anice Shelton, Elizabeth Furler, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Grace Chimene, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Joy Davis-Harasemay, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Diana Untermeyer, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Michelle Colvard, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Karen Vidor, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Malkia Hutchinson-Arvizu, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Anton Montano, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Helen Shelton, #9 Exhibit Declaration of Elizabeth Furler, #10 Exhibit Proposed Answer to Complaint, #11 Exhibit Proposed Opposition to Preliminary Injunction, #12 Proposed Order)(Segura, Andre)
November 1, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File Brief by Amici Curiae by Benjamin L. Ginsberg, Joseph R. Straus, III, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Trachtenberg, Mark)
November 1, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by The Lincoln Project, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Monty, Jacob)
November 1, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File to Exceed Page Limit by Chris Hollins, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mithoff, Richard)
November 1, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Chris Hollins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Mithoff, Richard)
November 1, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Mario Nicolais to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Lincoln Project, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Monty, Jacob)
November 1, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for John Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrea Chilton Greer, Common Cause Texas, Yekaterina Snezhkova, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Cohan, Lindsey)
November 1, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Neil Steiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrea Chilton Greer, Common Cause Texas, Yekaterina Snezhkova, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Cohan, Lindsey)
November 1, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Ezra Rosenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrea Chilton Greer, Common Cause Texas, Yekaterina Snezhkova, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Cohan, Lindsey)
November 1, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Jon Greenbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrea Chilton Greer, Common Cause Texas, Yekaterina Snezhkova, Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Cohan, Lindsey)
November 1, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Intervene by Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches, Common Cause Texas, Andrea Chilton Greer, Yekaterina Snezhkova, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bledsoe Decl., #2 Exhibit B - Gutierrez Decl., #3 Exhibit C - Greer Decl., #4 Exhibit D - Snezhkova Decl., #5 Exhibit Proposed Answer, #6 Proposed Order)(Cohan, Lindsey)
November 1, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Related Decision by Chris Hollins, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mithoff, Richard)
November 1, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing of Proposed Orders by Daniel Coleman, Mary Currie, Carlton Currie, Jr., DCCC, DSCC, MJ for Texas, Jekaya Simmons, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Motion to Appear Remotely, #2 Proposed Order Motion to Intervene, #3 Proposed Order Motion to File Opposition)(Howton, Skyler)
October 31, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Daniel Coleman, Mary Currie, Carlton Currie, Jr., DCCC, DSCC, MJ for Texas, Jekaya Simmons, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Proposed Opposition, #2 Exhibit Declaration of John Devaney, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of John Devaney, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of John Devaney, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of John Devaney, #6 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of John Devaney, #7 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of John Devaney, #8 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of John Devaney, #9 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of John Devaney, #10 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of John Devaney, #11 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of John Devaney)(Howton, Skyler)
October 31, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Approval of to Appear Remotely by Daniel Coleman, Mary Currie, Carlton Currie, Jr., DCCC, DSCC, MJ for Texas, Jekaya Simmons, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Howton, Skyler)
October 31, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Matthew Mertens to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Coleman, Mary Currie, Carlton Currie, Jr., DCCC, DSCC, MJ for Texas, Jekaya Simmons, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Howton, Skyler)
October 31, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for John Devaney to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Coleman, Mary Currie, Carlton Currie, Jr., DCCC, DSCC, MJ for Texas, Jekaya Simmons, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Howton, Skyler)
October 31, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Christina Ford to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Coleman, Mary Currie, Carlton Currie, Jr., DCCC, DSCC, MJ for Texas, Jekaya Simmons, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Howton, Skyler)
October 31, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Marc Elias to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Coleman, Mary Currie, Carlton Currie, Jr., DCCC, DSCC, MJ for Texas, Jekaya Simmons, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Elias, Marc)
October 31, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Daniel Osher to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Coleman, Mary Currie, Carlton Currie, Jr., DCCC, DSCC, MJ for Texas, Jekaya Simmons, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2020. (Osher, Daniel)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Setting as to #5 MOTION to Intervene, #1 Complaint, #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen, filed. (rhawkins)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Intervene by MJ for Texas, DSCC, DCCC, Mary Currie, Carlton Currie, Jr., Jekaya Simmons, Daniel Coleman, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Answer)(Howton, Skyler)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 BRIEF Support of Petitioners' Moton for a Preliminary Injunction re: #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Steven F. Hotze, MD, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Woodfill, Jared)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Steven F. Hotze, MD, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Woodfill, Jared)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/14/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(DawnWaggoneradi, 4)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25428296) filed by Steven F. Hotze, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A, #2 Exhibit Ex B, #3 Exhibit Ex C, #4 Exhibit Ex D, #5 Exhibit Ex E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woodfill, Jared)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hotze et al v. Hollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven F. Hotze, M.D.
Represented By: Jared Ryker Woodfill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: sharon hemphill
Represented By: Jared Ryker Woodfill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendell Champion
Represented By: Jared Ryker Woodfill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hon. Steve Toth
Represented By: Jared Ryker Woodfill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher G Hollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Hernandez for Congress
Represented By: S Nasim Ahmad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Lyn Royer
Represented By: Kenneth Royce Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Hollins
Represented By: Richard Warren Mithoff, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: JENN RAINEY
Represented By: Larry Richard Veselka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: ALAN MAUK
Represented By: Larry Richard Veselka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Yekaterina Snezhkova
Represented By: Lindsey Beth Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Helen Anice Shelton
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: ELAINE FRANKEL
Represented By: Larry Richard Veselka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: RUSSELL "RUSTY" HARDIN
Represented By: Larry Richard Veselka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: DOUGLAS MOLL
Represented By: Larry Richard Veselka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: RICHARD FRANKEL
Represented By: Larry Richard Veselka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Karen Vidor
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Michelle Colvard
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Diana Untermeyer
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: BRIAN SINGH
Represented By: Larry Richard Veselka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Malkia Hutchinson-Arvizu
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: JESSICA GOODSPERO
Represented By: Larry Richard Veselka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: CELIA VESELKA
Represented By: Larry Richard Veselka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Glenda Lee Greene
Represented By: Charles Stein Siegel
Represented By: Kenneth Royce Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Anton Montano
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: KIMBERLY PHIPPS-NICHOL
Represented By: Larry Richard Veselka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: NELSON VANEGAS
Represented By: Larry Richard Veselka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: SERGIO ALDANA
Represented By: Larry Richard Veselka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Andrea Chilton Greer
Represented By: Lindsey Beth Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: League of Women Voters of Texas
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Mr. Stanley G. Schneider
Represented By: Stanley G Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: S. Shawn Stephens
Represented By: Charles Stein Siegel
Represented By: Kenneth Royce Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: CAREY JORDAN
Represented By: Larry Richard Veselka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: MARY BACON
Represented By: Larry Richard Veselka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: RYAN FRANKEL
Represented By: Larry Richard Veselka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Jerelyn M Gooden
Represented By: Kenneth Royce Barrett
Represented By: Charles Stein Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Jamie Lynn Watson
Represented By: Charles Stein Siegel
Represented By: Kenneth Royce Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: NYGUEN GRIGGS
Represented By: Larry Richard Veselka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: AMY ASHMORE
Represented By: Larry Richard Veselka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Common Cause Texas
Represented By: Lindsey Beth Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: CHRISTINA MASSARA
Represented By: Larry Richard Veselka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Elizabeth Furler
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Joy Davis-Harasemay
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Michelle Royer
Represented By: Charles Stein Siegel
Represented By: Kenneth Royce Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches
Represented By: Lindsey Beth Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: DSCC
Represented By: Marc Elias
Represented By: Daniel Osher
Represented By: Skyler Michelle Howton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: David L. Hobbs
Represented By: David L. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Daniel Coleman
Represented By: Marc Elias
Represented By: Daniel Osher
Represented By: Skyler Michelle Howton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Carlton Currie, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Elias
Represented By: Daniel Osher
Represented By: Skyler Michelle Howton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: MJ for Texas
Represented By: Marc Elias
Represented By: Daniel Osher
Represented By: Skyler Michelle Howton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Mary Currie
Represented By: Marc Elias
Represented By: Daniel Osher
Represented By: Skyler Michelle Howton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Jekaya Simmons
Represented By: Marc Elias
Represented By: Daniel Osher
Represented By: Skyler Michelle Howton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Bettye Hobbs
Represented By: David L. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: DCCC
Represented By: Marc Elias
Represented By: Daniel Osher
Represented By: Skyler Michelle Howton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Joseph R. Straus, III
Represented By: Mark Ryan Trachtenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: 12 Cities and Counties
Represented By: Jessica Nicole Witte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Lincoln Project
Represented By: Jacob M. Monty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Benjamin L. Ginsberg
Represented By: Mark Ryan Trachtenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Election Law Professors
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Texas Coalition of Black Democrats
Represented By: Carvana Yvonne Cloud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Libertarian Party of Texas
Represented By: Jared G. LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?