Victory Lap et al v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Patriot Title, KQ WEST, Victory Lap, Reed, Attorneys and Counselors, Victory Lap Realty Investments, LLC and KQ West, LLC
Defendant: AVT Title, PHH Mortgage Corporation and Power Default Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv03802
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER. Trial Term: January/February 2022. ETT: 2 days. Bench trial. Amended Pleadings due by 2/5/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 2/5/2021 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 3/30/2021. Deft Expert Witness List due by 4/30/2021. Discovery due by 7/30/2021. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 8/31/2021. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 8/31/2021. Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/31/2021.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
January 7, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 1/7/2021. Scheduling order issue. Appearances: Paul J McConnell, III, Brett W Schouest.(ERO:Yes), filed.(jmarchand, 4)
January 5, 2021 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Schouest, Brett)
December 30, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Patriot Title, Reed, Attorneys and Counselors. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McConnell, Paul)
December 28, 2020 Filing 16 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by PHH Corporation, filed.(Schouest, Brett)
December 21, 2020 Filing 15 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Patriot Title, Reed, Attorneys and Counselors, filed.(Baring, Ben)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to Defendants AVT Title Services, LLC and Power Default Services, Inc.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
December 14, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by PHH Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Schouest, Brett)
December 14, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Reed, Attorneys and Counselors, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baring, Ben)
December 4, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by AVT Title, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cronenwett, Mark)
November 30, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PHH Mortgage Corporation filed by Reed, Attorneys and Counselors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(McConnell, Paul)
November 23, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by AVT Title, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Victory Lap Realty Investments, LLC, filed.(McConnell, Paul)
November 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Cronenwett on behalf of AVT Title, filed. (Cronenwett, Mark)
November 16, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Power Default Services, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Power Default Services Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss)(Schouest, Brett)
November 16, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal by PHH Mortgage Corporation, filed.(Schouest, Brett)
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Service in a Removed Action by PHH Mortgage Corporation, Power Default Services, Inc., filed.(Schouest, Brett)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(RuthGuerreroadi, 4)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by PHH Mortgage Corporation, Power Default Services, Inc., filed.(Schouest, Brett)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, case number 2020-67729 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25481272) filed by Power Default Services, Inc., PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit INDEX, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Schouest, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Victory Lap et al v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVT Title
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Brett W Schouest
Represented By: Neyma Edelyn Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Default Services, Inc.
Represented By: Brett W Schouest
Represented By: Neyma Edelyn Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patriot Title
Represented By: Paul J McConnell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KQ WEST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victory Lap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reed, Attorneys and Counselors
Represented By: Paul J McConnell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victory Lap Realty Investments, LLC
Represented By: Paul J McConnell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KQ West, LLC
Represented By: Paul J McConnell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?