DrWanted.com, LLC v. NSR Physicians, P.A. et al
Plaintiff: DrWanted.com, LLC
Defendant: Hospital Docs, P.A. and NSR Physicians, P.A.
Case Number: 4:2020cv03822
Filed: November 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by George Edwards III on behalf of Hospital Docs, P.A., filed. (Edwards, George)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Hospital Docs, P.A., filed.(Sutarwalla, Murtaza)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Seth Katz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Seth Katz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by DrWanted.com, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/8/2020. (McDowell, David)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/19/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(RubenCastroadi, 4)
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hospital Docs, P.A., NSR Physicians, P.A.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4)
November 10, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation)(McDowell, David)
November 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hospital Docs, P.A., NSR Physicians, P.A. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25488383) filed by DrWanted.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McDowell, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DrWanted.com, LLC v. NSR Physicians, P.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital Docs, P.A.
Represented By: Murtaza Fakhruddin Sutarwalla
Represented By: George Edwards, IIl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSR Physicians, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DrWanted.com, LLC
Represented By: David T McDowell
Represented By: Seth Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?