Harris v. Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.
Plaintiff: Janet Harris
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart, Inc., Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv03934
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc,, Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc., filed.(Ramirez, John)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Janet Harris.(Leeds, Jacques)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury6 Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., filed.(Ramirez, John)
December 4, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Janet Harris, filed.(Leeds, Jacques)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/5/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4)
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25536930) filed by Janet Harris.(Leeds, Jacques)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Harris
Represented By: Jacques Pierre Leeds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.
Represented By: John A. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Represented By: John A. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc.
Represented By: John A. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc,
Represented By: John A. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: John A. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?