US Synthetic Corporation v. Element Six US Corporation et al
Plaintiff: US Synthetic Corporation
Defendant: Element Six Limited, Element Six Hard Materials (Wuxi) Co., Ltd., Element Six Abrasives Holdings, Ltd., Element Six Trading (Shanghai) Co. Limited, Element Six Production (Pty) Limited, Element Six Global Innovation Centre, ServSix US, Element Six US Corporation, Synergy Materials Technology Ltd. and Element Six GmbH
Case Number: 4:2020cv03963
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time Initial Conference is reset to 4/14/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison and Scheduling Conference is reset to 4/14/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
December 23, 2020 Filing 29 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time for Element Six Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Miranda)
December 23, 2020 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Element Six Abrasives Holdings, Ltd. served on 12/23/2020, answer due 3/23/2021; Element Six Global Innovation Centre served on 12/23/2020, answer due 3/23/2021; Element Six GmbH served on 12/23/2020, answer due 3/23/2021; Element Six Hard Materials (Wuxi) Co., Ltd. served on 12/23/2020, answer due 3/23/2021; Element Six Limited served on 12/23/2020, answer due 3/23/2021; Element Six Production (Pty) Limited served on 12/23/2020, answer due 3/23/2021; Element Six Trading (Shanghai) Co. Limited served on 12/23/2020, answer due 3/23/2021; ServSix US served on 12/23/2020, answer due 3/23/2021; Synergy Materials Technology Ltd. served on 12/23/2020, answer due 3/23/2021, filed.(Jones, Miranda)
December 7, 2020 Filing 27 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Element Six US Corporation served on 12/2/2020, answer due 12/23/2020, filed.(Jones, Miranda)
December 3, 2020 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by US Synthetic Corporation, filed.(Jones, Miranda)
December 1, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin C. Villasenor on behalf of US Synthetic Corporation, filed. (Jones, Miranda)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Kelly Horn to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Alexander Harding to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Mareesa Frederick to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Daniel Cooley to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #15 Motion for James Barney to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
November 30, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Kelly S. Horn to Appear Pro Hac Vice by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/21/2020. (Jones, Miranda)
November 30, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Alexander E. Harding to Appear Pro Hac Vice by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/21/2020. (Jones, Miranda)
November 30, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Mareesa A. Frederick to Appear Pro Hac Vice by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/21/2020. (Jones, Miranda)
November 30, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Daniel C. Cooley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/21/2020. (Jones, Miranda)
November 30, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for James R. Barney to Appear Pro Hac Vice by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/21/2020. (Jones, Miranda)
November 24, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(JacquelineMata, 4)
November 23, 2020 Filing 13 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ShadiaNashadi, 4)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/10/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ShadiaNashadi, 4)
November 23, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Synergy Materials Technology Ltd., filed.(Jones, Miranda)
November 23, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Issuance of Summons as to ServSix US, filed.(Jones, Miranda)
November 23, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Element Six Trading (Shanghai) Co. Limited, filed.(Jones, Miranda)
November 23, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Element Six Hard Materials (Wuxi) Co., Ltd., filed.(Jones, Miranda)
November 23, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Element Six Production (Pty) Limited, filed.(Jones, Miranda)
November 23, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Element Six Limited, filed.(Jones, Miranda)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Element Six GmbH, filed.(Jones, Miranda)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Element Six Abrasives Holdings, Ltd., filed.(Jones, Miranda)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Element Six Global Innovation Centre, filed.(Jones, Miranda)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Element Six US Corporation, filed.(Jones, Miranda)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25545482) filed by US Synthetic Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Jones, Miranda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Synthetic Corporation v. Element Six US Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Element Six Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Element Six Hard Materials (Wuxi) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Element Six Abrasives Holdings, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Element Six Trading (Shanghai) Co. Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Element Six Production (Pty) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Element Six Global Innovation Centre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ServSix US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Element Six US Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synergy Materials Technology Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Element Six GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Synthetic Corporation
Represented By: Miranda Yan Jones
Represented By: James R. Barney
Represented By: Alexander E. Harding
Represented By: Daniel C. Cooley
Represented By: Kelly S. Horn
Represented By: Mareesa A. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?