US Synthetic Corporation v. Iljin Diamond Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: US Synthetic Corporation
Defendant: Iljin Diamond Co., Ltd., Iljin Holdings Co., Ltd., Iljin USA Inc., Iljin China Co., Ltd., Iljin Japan Co., Ltd. and Iljin Europe GmbH
Case Number: 4:2020cv03968
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Stay. The case is STAYED pending the conclusion of the related ITC proceedings, including any appeals.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
December 23, 2020 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Iljin USA Inc., filed.(Chiaviello, Elizabeth)
December 23, 2020 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Defendant Iljin USA Inc,'s Unopposed Motion to Stay Pending Related ITC Proceedings by Iljin USA Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Chiaviello, Elizabeth)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Kelly Horn to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
December 17, 2020 Filing 28 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Iljin USA Inc. served on 12/2/2020, answer due 12/23/2020, filed.(Jones, Miranda)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #21 Corrected Motion for Alexander E. Harding to Appear Pro Hac Vice for US Synthetic Corporation ; terminating #14 Motion for Alexander E. Harding to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #20 Corrected Motion for Mareesa A. Frederick to Appear Pro Hac Vice for US Synthetic Corporation ; terminating #13 Motion for Mareesa A. Frederick to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #19 Corrected Motion for Daniel C. Cooley to Appear Pro Hac Vice for US Synthetic Corporation; terminating #12 Motion for Daniel C. Cooley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #18 Corrected Motion for James R. Barney to Appear Pro Hac Vice for US Synthetic Corporation ; terminating #11 Motion for James R. Barney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
December 3, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by US Synthetic Corporation, filed.(Jones, Miranda)
December 1, 2020 Filing 22 Corrected MOTION for Kelly S. Horn to Appear Pro Hac Vice by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/22/2020. (Jones, Miranda)
December 1, 2020 Filing 21 Corrected MOTION for Alexander E. Harding to Appear Pro Hac Vice by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/22/2020. (Jones, Miranda)
December 1, 2020 Filing 20 Corrected MOTION for Mareesa A. Frederick to Appear Pro Hac Vice by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/22/2020. (Jones, Miranda)
December 1, 2020 Filing 19 Corrected MOTION for Daniel C. Cooley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/22/2020. (Jones, Miranda)
December 1, 2020 Filing 18 Corrected MOTION for James R. Barney to Appear Pro Hac Vice by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/22/2020. (Jones, Miranda)
December 1, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin C. Villasenor on behalf of US Synthetic Corporation, filed. (Jones, Miranda)
December 1, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE to Withdraw Documents re: #11 MOTION for James R. Barney to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #12 MOTION for Daniel C. Cooley to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #13 MOTION for Mareesa A. Frederick to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #15 MOTION for Kelly S. Horn to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #14 MOTION for Alexander E. Harding to Appear Pro Hac Vice by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. (Jones, Miranda)
November 30, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Kelly S. Horn to Appear Pro Hac Vice by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/21/2020. (Jones, Miranda)
November 30, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Alexander E. Harding to Appear Pro Hac Vice by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/21/2020. (Jones, Miranda)
November 30, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Mareesa A. Frederick to Appear Pro Hac Vice by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/21/2020. (Jones, Miranda)
November 30, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Daniel C. Cooley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/21/2020. (Jones, Miranda)
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for James R. Barney to Appear Pro Hac Vice by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/21/2020. (Jones, Miranda)
November 24, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(JacquelineMata, 4)
November 24, 2020 Filing 9 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ShadiaNashadi, 4)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/19/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ShadiaNashadi, 4)
November 23, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Iljin China Co., Ltd., filed.(Jones, Miranda)
November 23, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Iljin Japan Co., Ltd., filed.(Jones, Miranda)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Iljin Europe GmbH, filed.(Jones, Miranda)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Iljin USA Inc., filed.(Jones, Miranda)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Iljin Holdings Co., Ltd., filed.(Jones, Miranda)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Iljin Diamond Co., Ltd., filed.(Jones, Miranda)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25546720) filed by US Synthetic Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Jones, Miranda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Synthetic Corporation v. Iljin Diamond Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iljin Diamond Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iljin Holdings Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iljin USA Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Mooar Chiaviello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iljin China Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iljin Japan Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iljin Europe GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Synthetic Corporation
Represented By: Miranda Yan Jones
Represented By: Daniel C. Cooley
Represented By: Alexander E. Harding
Represented By: James R. Barney
Represented By: Kelly S. Horn
Represented By: Mareesa A. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?