US Synthetic Corporation v. SF Diamond Co. Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: US Synthetic Corporation
Defendant: SF Diamond Co. Ltd. and SF Diamond USA, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv03974
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SF Diamond Co. Ltd., SF Diamond USA, Inc., filed.(Byron, John)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #22 Unopposed MOTION to Stay (Status Report due by 4/2/2021, and every 60 days thereafter.), Deadlines terminated, Case stayed (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Hui Shen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Matthew N. Bathon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Timothy Bickham to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) Modified on 1/13/2021 (aboyd, 4).
January 12, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Hui Shen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by SF Diamond Co. Ltd., SF Diamond USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(mmapps, 4)
January 12, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Timothy Bickham to Appear Pro Hac Vice by SF Diamond Co. Ltd., SF Diamond USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(mmapps, 4)
January 12, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Matthew Bathon to Appear Pro Hac Vice by SF Diamond Co. Ltd., SF Diamond USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(mmapps, 4)
January 12, 2021 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to Stay by SF Diamond Co. Ltd., SF Diamond USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Byron, John)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting #20 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant SF Diamond USA Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint ; Answer due by 2/22/2021...*** Initial Conference reset for 3/19/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
December 23, 2020 Filing 20 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant SF Diamond USA Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Miranda)
December 17, 2020 Filing 19 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to SF Diamond USA, Inc. served on 12/2/2020, answer due 12/23/2020, filed.(Jones, Miranda)
December 3, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by US Synthetic Corporation, filed.(Jones, Miranda)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Kelly S. Horn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Alexander E. Harding to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Mareesa A. Frederick to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Daniel C. Cooley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 Motion for James R. Barney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
December 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin C. Villasenor on behalf of US Synthetic Corporation, filed. (Jones, Miranda)
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Kelly S. Horn to Appear Pro Hac Vice by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/21/2020. (Jones, Miranda)
November 30, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Alexander E. Harding to Appear Pro Hac Vice by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/21/2020. (Jones, Miranda)
November 30, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Mareesa A. Frederick to Appear Pro Hac Vice by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/21/2020. (Jones, Miranda)
November 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Daniel C. Cooley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/21/2020. (Jones, Miranda)
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for James R. Barney to Appear Pro Hac Vice by US Synthetic Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/21/2020. (Jones, Miranda)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JacquelineMata, 4)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to SF Diamond USA, Inc., filed.(Jones, Miranda)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to SF Diamond Co. Ltd., filed.(Jones, Miranda)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ShadiaNashadi, 4)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/5/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(ShadiaNashadi, 4)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25547941) filed by US Synthetic Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Jones, Miranda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Synthetic Corporation v. SF Diamond Co. Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Synthetic Corporation
Represented By: Miranda Yan Jones
Represented By: James R. Barney
Represented By: Alexander E. Harding
Represented By: Daniel C. Cooley
Represented By: Kelly S. Horn
Represented By: Erin C Villasenor
Represented By: Mareesa A. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SF Diamond Co. Ltd.
Represented By: John J Byron
Represented By: Timothy C. Bickham
Represented By: Hui Shen
Represented By: Matthew Bathon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SF Diamond USA, Inc.
Represented By: John J Byron
Represented By: Timothy C. Bickham
Represented By: Hui Shen
Represented By: Matthew Bathon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?