Belanger v. McDermott International et al
Plaintiff: Todd Michael Belanger
Defendant: J Ray McDermott, Inc., J Ray McDermott SA, MCDERMOTT INTERNATIONAL and McDermott, Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv04089
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 883
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by J Ray McDermott SA, J Ray McDermott, Inc, McDermott International, McDermott International, Inc., McDermott, Inc, filed.(Gallant, Walter)
January 28, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by J Ray McDermott SA, J Ray McDermott, Inc, McDermott International, Inc., McDermott, Inc, filed.(Gallant, Walter)
December 16, 2020 Filing 14 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Christopher St Martin re: #7 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (EdnitaPonce, 1)
December 16, 2020 Filing 13 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Christopher St Martin re: #9 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (EdnitaPonce, 1)
December 16, 2020 Filing 12 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Christopher St Martin re: #8 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (EdnitaPonce, 1)
December 15, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants, filed.(Bourque, Charles)
December 11, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Todd Michael Belanger, filed.(Bourque, Charles)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Joseph G. Jevic, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Todd Michael Belanger. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Charles C. Bourque, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Todd Michael Belanger. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Christopher J. St. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Todd Michael Belanger. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 4/26/2021 at 08:45 AM by telephone before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4)
December 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Christopher J. St. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Todd Michael Belanger, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/23/2020. (Dennis, Patrick)
December 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Charles Bourque, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Todd Michael Belanger, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/23/2020. (Dennis, Patrick)
December 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Joseph Jevic to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Todd Michael Belanger, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/23/2020. (Dennis, Patrick)
December 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case by Todd Michael Belanger, filed. (Dennis, Patrick)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25596786) filed by Todd Michael Belanger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dennis, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belanger v. McDermott International et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Michael Belanger
Represented By: Patrick Mason Dennis
Represented By: Christopher St Martin
Represented By: Charles Bourque, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph G Jevic, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Ray McDermott, Inc.
Represented By: Walter Joseph Gallant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Ray McDermott SA
Represented By: Walter Joseph Gallant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCDERMOTT INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: Walter Joseph Gallant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDermott, Inc
Represented By: Walter Joseph Gallant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?