Esquivel v. Downhole Technology LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Mast, Carlos Esquivel, Bret Nitzsche, Ryan Taylor, Wally Suarez, Heath Simmons, Shannon Dinger, Hervey Botello, Preston Walters, Danny Driskill, Brad Schmader, Neil Figurel, Mike Shoemaker, Ryan Anderson, Ruben Gonzalez, Travis Seaton, Justin Mendoza, Logan Tow, Brian Robinson, Jack Hiatt, Travis McGill, Johnny Torrez, Chris McElroy, Jesse Rivera, Josh Layton, Michael Sargent, Nathan Green, Eric Grado, Aaron DeFever, Bryan Donaldson, Brandon Cummins, Manuel Hernandez, Paul Walters, Kevin Bruton, Esteban Rodiguez, Zack Anderson, Cody Watson and Grady Rakestraw
Defendant: National Boss Hog Energy Services LLC, The Wellboss Company LLC and Downhole Technology LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00181
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/7/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(mmapps, 4)
January 19, 2021 Filing 70 Case transferred in from Texas Western. Case Number 7:20-cv-00038; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
January 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #68 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge David Counts. (slt)
December 29, 2020 Filing 68 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #41 Motion to Transfer Case filed by The Wellboss Company LLC. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (ja)
September 4, 2020 Filing 67 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by The Wellboss Company LLC, re #41 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue and Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant The Wellboss Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Williamson, Holly)
August 31, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
August 28, 2020 Filing 65 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Carlos Esquivel, re #41 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue and Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant The Wellboss Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miltenberger, Chris)
August 28, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Arbitration by Downhole Technology LLC, National Boss Hog Energy Services LLC, The Wellboss Company LLC (Williamson, Holly) Modified to name correct filers - removed "Travis Seaton" and replaced with Downhole Technology, LLC on 8/28/2020 (slt).
August 14, 2020 Case No Longer Stayed (slt)
August 13, 2020 Filing 63 Notice of Alternative Dispute Resolution/Mediation Outcome: Did not Settle.(Miltenberger, Chris)
July 22, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE of Consent to Join of Marcus Mendoza by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
July 13, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of Consent to Join of Nicholas Garcia by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
July 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: ADR Mediation Completed by 8/14/2020. (slt)
July 2, 2020 It is ORDERED the Parties' Joint Motion to Extend Stay Pending Mediation, Doc. #60 filed July 1, 2020, is GRANTED. Accordingly, this matter is stayed until after the parties mediate. It is further ORDERED this case shall be mediated on or before August 14, 2020. The parties shall notify the Court on August 17, 2020, the outcome of mediation. If the parties do not resolve the case in mediation, Plaintiff Esquivel will respond to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue and Compel Arbitration no later than August 28, 2020. No further requests for extensions of time to mediate will be granted without extraordinary circumstances. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
July 1, 2020 Filing 60 Joint MOTION to Stay Case by Carlos Esquivel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Miltenberger, Chris)
June 9, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Consent to Join of Joaquin Campos by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
June 9, 2020 Case Stayed (slt)
June 9, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Consent to Join of Villareal and Nelson by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order It is ORDERED the Parties' Joint Motion to Stay, Doc. #57 filed June 8, 2020, is GRANTED. Accordingly, this matter is stayed until after the parties' mediation to be held on June 30, 2020. The parties shall notify the Court on July 1, 2020, the outcome of mediation. If the parties do not resolve the case in mediation, Plaintiff Esquivel will respond to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue and Compel Arbitration no later than July 15, 2020. Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db
June 8, 2020 Filing 57 Joint MOTION to Stay Case by Carlos Esquivel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Miltenberger, Chris)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #56 Joint Motion to Extend Plaintiff Carlos Esquivel's Response Date to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue and Compel Arbitration. The Plaintiff shall file their response to the Defendants' Motion on or before June 8, 2020. Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
May 26, 2020 Filing 56 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Carlos Esquivel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Miltenberger, Chris)
May 26, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Consent to Join of Adrian Calderon by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
May 26, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE of Consent to Join of Jesse Davis and Cody Lambert by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
May 25, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Consent to Join of Lane Brown, Hershel Parker and Aaron Normand by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
May 22, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Rigoberto Cisneros, Joshua Orona and Julian Orona by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
May 21, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Consent to Join of Dean Hunter by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
May 20, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Consent to Join of Jessie Mikeska by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #49 Joint Motion to Extend Plaintiff Carlos Esquivel's Response Date to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue and Compel Arbitration. The Plaintiff shall file their response on or before May 25, 2020. Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
May 11, 2020 Filing 49 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #41 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue and Motion to Compel Arbitration by Carlos Esquivel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Miltenberger, Chris)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICEAS TO MANNY FRANKLIN/ORDER re #47 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Carlos Esquivel. Signed by Judge David Counts. (slt)
May 7, 2020 Filing 47 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims of Manny Franklin by Carlos Esquivel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miltenberger, Chris)
April 23, 2020 Filing 46 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Carlos Esquivel.(Miltenberger, Chris)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #45 Joint Motion to Extend Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue and Compel Arbitration. It is ORDERED the Plaintiff's time to respond to the Defendant's Motion is extended to May 11, 2020. Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
April 22, 2020 Filing 45 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response by Carlos Esquivel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Miltenberger, Chris)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #42 Joint Motion to Extend Plaintiff Carlos Esquivel's Response Date to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue and Compel Arbitration. The Plaintiff shall file their response on or before April 27, 2020. Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
April 10, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Matt Plott by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
April 10, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Manny Franklin and Jeremy Evans by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
April 9, 2020 Filing 42 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #41 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue and Motion to Compel Arbitration by Carlos Esquivel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Miltenberger, Chris)
April 6, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue and Motion to Compel Arbitration by The Wellboss Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Williamson, Holly)
April 5, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Consent to Join of Clayton Hodgson by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
April 5, 2020 Filing 39 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Carlos Esquivel.(Miltenberger, Chris)
April 2, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Ruben Gonzalez by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
April 1, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE Corrected Consent to Join of Chris McElroy by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
April 1, 2020 Filing 36 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #35 Notice (Other) (slt)
April 1, 2020 Filing 35 ***See Deficiency Notice*** NOTICE of Consent to Join of Chris McElroy by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris) Modified on 4/1/2020 (slt).
March 24, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Consent to Join of Shannon Dinger by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
March 18, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
March 18, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
March 17, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
March 16, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
March 16, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
March 14, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
March 13, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
March 13, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
March 12, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
March 12, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
March 12, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
March 11, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
March 11, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
March 11, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
March 11, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
March 10, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
March 10, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
March 10, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
March 10, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
March 9, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
March 8, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
March 8, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
March 6, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
March 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
March 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
March 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Consent to Join by Carlos Esquivel (Miltenberger, Chris)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ronald C. Griffin. Signed by Judge David Counts. (slt)
February 11, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to The Wellboss Company LLC. (slt)
February 11, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Downhole Technology LLC. (slt)
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to National Boss Hog Energy Services LLC. (slt)
February 11, 2020 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (slt)
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Parties by Carlos Esquivel. (Miltenberger, Chris)
February 11, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Carlos Esquivel. (Miltenberger, Chris)
February 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13193982), filed by Carlos Esquivel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miltenberger, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Esquivel v. Downhole Technology LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Mast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Esquivel
Represented By: Chris R Miltenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bret Nitzsche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wally Suarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heath Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Dinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hervey Botello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preston Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Driskill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Schmader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Figurel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Shoemaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Seaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Logan Tow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Hiatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Torrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Layton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sargent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Grado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron DeFever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Donaldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Bruton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esteban Rodiguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zack Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grady Rakestraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Boss Hog Energy Services LLC
Represented By: William Michael Reed
Represented By: Holly H. Williamson
Represented By: Jessica Knapp Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wellboss Company LLC
Represented By: William Michael Reed
Represented By: Holly H. Williamson
Represented By: Jessica Knapp Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Downhole Technology LLC
Represented By: William Michael Reed
Represented By: Holly H. Williamson
Represented By: Jessica Knapp Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?