Tuttle et al v. City Of Houston et al
Plaintiff: Dennis W. Tuttle, Clifford Tuttle, Ryan Tuttle, Robert Tuttle, John Nicholas, Clifford F. Tuttle, Jr. and Jo Ann Nicholas
Defendant: Steven Bryant, Robert Gonzales, Thomas Wood, George Goines, Marsha Todd, Eric Sepolio, Cedell Lovings, Nadeem Ashraf, City Of Houston, Manuel Salazar, Oscar Pardo, Frank Medina, Clemente Reyna, Felipe Gallegos and Gerald Goines
Case Number: 4:2021cv00270
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Steven Bryant, filed.(Nachtigall, David)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Consolidate Cases: Lead Case No. 4:21cv270 and Member Case No. 4:21cv272.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
March 23, 2021 Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gerald Goines, filed.(Day, Dwayne)
March 16, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss and Opposed Motion to Stay by Nadeem Ashraf, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Morefield, Bradley)
March 15, 2021 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Steven Bryant, filed.(Nachtigall, David)
March 15, 2021 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 4:21cv270 and Member Case No. 4:21cv272 by Clifford F. Tuttle, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Motion to Consolidate)(Gallagher, Michael)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
March 11, 2021 Filing 30 Summons Issued as to Eric Sepolio. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ChristopherSarrat, 4)
March 10, 2021 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION Unopposed Mtn to Extend by Clifford F. Tuttle, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Unopp Mtn to Extend)(Gallagher, Michael)
March 10, 2021 Filing 28 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Eric Sepolio, filed.(Gallagher, Michael)
March 5, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss by City Of Houston, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/26/2021. (Martin, Christy)
March 5, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternatively, Opposed Motion to Stay by Clemente Reyna, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Proposed Order)(Morefield, Bradley)
March 5, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternatively, Opposed Motion to Stay by Thomas Wood, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Morefield, Bradley)
March 5, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Motion Docket Date 3/26/2021.), Opposed MOTION to Stay by Cedell Lovings, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Azadeh, Melissa)
March 4, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternatively, Opposed Motion to Stay by Robert Gonzales, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Morefield, Bradley)
March 4, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Motion Docket Date 3/25/2021.), Opposed MOTION to Stay by Oscar Pardo, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Azadeh, Melissa)
March 3, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternatively, Opposed Motion to Stay by Frank Medina, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Martin, Christy)
March 3, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by Marsha Todd, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/24/2021. (Dempsey, Kelly)
February 24, 2021 Filing 19 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Nadeem Ashraf served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021, filed.(BrendaLacy, 4)
February 24, 2021 Filing 18 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Marsha Todd served on 2/10/2021, answer due 3/3/2021, filed.(BrendaLacy, 4)
February 24, 2021 Filing 17 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Eric Sepolio served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021, filed.(BrendaLacy, 4)
February 23, 2021 Filing 16 RETURN of Service Executed as to Clemente Reyna on 2/12/2021 re: Summons and Complaint, filed.(jguajardo, 4)
February 23, 2021 Filing 15 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Frank Medina served on 2/10/2021, answer due 3/3/2021, filed.(ckrus, 4)
February 22, 2021 Filing 14 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Oscar Pardo served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021, filed.(thanniable, 4)
February 22, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Gerald Goines served on 2/12/2021, answer due 3/5/2021, filed.(thanniable, 4)
February 22, 2021 Filing 12 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Thomas Wood served on 2/12/2021, answer due 3/5/2021, filed.(thanniable, 4)
February 19, 2021 Filing 11 First MOTION to Dismiss and Alternatively, Opposed Motion to Stay by Felipe Gallegos, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martin, Christy)
February 12, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Steven Bryant served on 2/10/2021, answer due 3/3/2021, filed.(ckrus, 4)
February 12, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Clifford F. Tuttle, Jr, filed.(Gallagher, Michael)
February 5, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to City Of Houston served on 2/3/2021, answer due 2/24/2021, filed.(Gallagher, Michael)
February 4, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Nadeem Ashraf, Steven Bryant, Gerald Goines, Robert Gonzales, Cedell Lovings, Frank Medina, Oscar Pardo, Clemente Reyna, Manuel Salazar, Eric Sepolio, Marsha Todd, Thomas Wood. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(ChristopherSarrat, 4)
February 3, 2021 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons Cedell Lovings, #2 Summons Clemente Reyna, #3 Summons Eric Sepolio, #4 Summons Frank Medina, #5 Summons Manuel Salazar, #6 Summons Marsha Todd, #7 Summons Nadeem Ashraf, #8 Summons Oscar Pardo, #9 Summons Robert Gonzalez, #10 Summons Steven Bryant, #11 Summons Thomas Wood)(Gallagher, Michael)
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to City Of Houston. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to City Of Houston, filed.(Gallagher, Michael)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to City Of Houston, filed.(Gallagher, Michael)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/30/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(JacquelineMataadi, 4)
January 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25874144) filed by Clifford Tuttle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Plaintiff Clifford Tuttle, #2 Summons City of Houston)(Gallagher, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tuttle et al v. City Of Houston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis W. Tuttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Tuttle
Represented By: Michael T Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Tuttle
Represented By: Michael T Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Tuttle
Represented By: Michael T Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Nicholas
Represented By: Michael Patrick Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford F. Tuttle, Jr.
Represented By: Michael T Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo Ann Nicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey I Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Bryant
Represented By: David Allen Nachtigall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gonzales
Represented By: Bradley Aaron Morefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Wood
Represented By: Bradley Aaron Morefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Goines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha Todd
Represented By: Kelly Ann Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Sepolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedell Lovings
Represented By: Melissa Azadeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nadeem Ashraf
Represented By: Bradley Aaron Morefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Houston
Represented By: Christy L Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar Pardo
Represented By: Melissa Azadeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Medina
Represented By: Christy L Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clemente Reyna
Represented By: Bradley Aaron Morefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felipe Gallegos
Represented By: Christy L Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Goines
Represented By: Dwayne Richard Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?