SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION v. CHRISTIAN BROTHERS SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL BENEFITS ADMINISTRATION, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc, NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE, FRATES BENEFITS ADMINISTRATORS, Geico, HOCHHEIM PRAIRIE INSURANCE, Great American Insurance Company, HEALTHSCOPE BENEFITS, Fred Loya Insurance, SENDERO HEALTH PLANS, UHA HEALTH INSURANCE, Medova Health Care Financial Group, LLC, CONSUMER COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, CHRISTIAN BROTHERS SERVICES, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES HEALTH ASSOCIATION, INC., HEALTHCOMP, LLC, Community Health Choice, Nationwide, LIFESTYLES HEALTH PLANS, Group and Pension Administrators Inc, Gallagher Bassett Services Inc, CONTINENTAL BENEFITS, KEENAN & ASSOCIATES, Christus Health Plan, HEALTHSMART BENEFITS MANAGEMENTS and HEALTH PARTNERS OF MINNESOTA
Case Number: 4:2021cv00275
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 99 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Group and Pension Administrators Inc, filed.(Akins, William)
March 31, 2021 Filing 98 ANSWER to #33 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,,,, Crossclaim,,, with Jury Demand, ANSWER to #33 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #34 Answer to Complaint,,,, Crossclaim,( #1 Notice of Removal),, with Jury Demand by FRATES BENEFITS ADMINISTRATORS, filed.(Augustine, Steven)
March 30, 2021 Filing 97 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Answer or Respond by Group and Pension Administrators Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Akins, William)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #93 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for FRATES BENEFITS ADMINISTRATORS 3/31/2021.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #93 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for SENDERO HEALTH PLANS 4/12/2021.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
March 26, 2021 Filing 94 STIPULATION re: Extension of Deadline for Sendero to Answer/Respond to Complaint by SENDERO HEALTH PLANS, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order - Granting Agreed Stipulation to Extend Deadline)(Munoz, Nicole)
March 24, 2021 Filing 93 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by FRATES BENEFITS ADMINISTRATORS, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/14/2021. (Foley, Zandra)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ACTION AGAINST CONTINENTAL BENEFITS.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
March 18, 2021 Filing 91 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney PATRICK C. TIMONEY re: #73 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,, filed. The address was updated and the Order was re-noticed. (JosephWells, 4)
March 15, 2021 Filing 90 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney MATTHEW S. MARRONE as to FRATES BENEFITS ADMINISTRATORS re: #86 Order on Motion to Set Aside, filed. (ckrus, 4)
March 11, 2021 Filing 89 STIPULATION of Dismissal Unopposed Notice of Dismissal of Action Against and Defendant Continental Benefits by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Joint Stipulation of Dismissal - Continental Benefits)(Giadrosich, Matthew)
March 11, 2021 Filing 88 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney MICHAEL A. MOURTZANAKIS re: #86 Order on Motion to Set Aside, filed. (jguajardo, 4)
March 5, 2021 Filing 87 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney MICHAEL A. MOURTZANAKIS as to CONSUMER COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY re: #73 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,, filed. (rguerrero, 4) Attorney address corrected, document resent.
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #80 Motion to Set Aside..(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
February 26, 2021 Filing 85 Unopposed PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING SENDERO HEALTH PLANS, INC.'S re: #80 Unopposed MOTION to Set Aside, 63 Clerks Entry of Default, filed.(Munoz, Nicole)
February 24, 2021 Filing 84 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by HEALTHCOMP, LLC, filed.(Thayer, Mark)
February 22, 2021 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W. Thayer on behalf of HEALTHCOMP, LLC, filed. (Thayer, Mark)
February 22, 2021 Filing 82 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney MATTHEW S. MARRONE as to FRATES BENEFITS ADMINISTRATORS re: #73 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,, filed. (BrendaLacy, 4)
February 19, 2021 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura E. De Santos and Mark W. Thayer on behalf of HEALTHCOMP, LLC, filed. (De Santos, Laura)
February 12, 2021 Filing 80 Unopposed MOTION to Set Aside by SENDERO HEALTH PLANS, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex. A - Affidavit in Support)(Munoz, Nicole)
February 12, 2021 Filing 79 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Community Health Choice, filed.(Shely, John)
February 12, 2021 Filing 78 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, filed.(Giadrosich, Matthew)
February 12, 2021 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Giadrosich on behalf of SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, filed. (Giadrosich, Matthew)
February 1, 2021 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey J. Hope on behalf of Community Health Choice, filed. (Hope, Kelsey)
February 1, 2021 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Shely on behalf of Community Health Choice, filed. (Shely, John)
January 29, 2021 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew G. Jubinsky and Nicole H. Munoz-Huschka on behalf of SENDERO HEALTH PLANS, filed. (Jubinsky, Andrew)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/17/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(mmapps, 4)
January 28, 2021 Filing 72 Case transferred in from New Jersey. Case Number 3:20-cv-10801; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
January 27, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (jdb)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER transferring case to USDC for the Southern District of Texas. Moving Defendants' various motions to dismiss and/or transfer this matter (ECF Nos. #3 , #5 , #7 , #14 , #24 ) are all denied without prejudice; Plaintiff's motion to remand (ECF No. #9 ) is denied; and Plaintiff's motions for default judgment against Defaulting Defendants (ECF Nos. #55 , #56 ) are denied without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 1/27/2021. (jdb)
January 25, 2021 Filing 70 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to International Benefits Administration by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (MITNICK, STEVEN)
January 25, 2021 Filing 69 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Gallagher Bassett Services Inc. by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (MITNICK, STEVEN)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 LETTER ORDER withdrawing #64 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant, International Benefits Administration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 1/21/2021. (jdb)
January 20, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #67 MOTION to Withdraw motion to enter default judgment. Motion set for 2/16/2021 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mg)
January 20, 2021 Filing 67 MOTION to Withdraw motion to enter default judgment by All Plaintiffs. (MITNICK, STEVEN)
December 28, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #65 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Sendero Health Plans, #64 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant, International Benefits Administration, #66 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Keenan & Associates. Motion set for 2/1/2021 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mg)
December 28, 2020 Filing 66 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Keenan & Associates by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. Responses due by 1/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MITNICK, STEVEN)
December 28, 2020 Filing 65 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Sendero Health Plans by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. Responses due by 1/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MITNICK, STEVEN)
December 28, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant, International Benefits Administration by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. Responses due by 1/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MITNICK, STEVEN)
December 15, 2020 Filing 63 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to KEENAN AND ASSOCIATES, SENDERO HEALTH PLANS, INTERNATIONAL BENEFITS ASSOCIATION for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (mg)
December 14, 2020 Filing 62 Request for Default by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION against Sendero Health Plans. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(MITNICK, STEVEN)
December 14, 2020 Filing 61 Request for Default by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION against International Benefits Association. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(MITNICK, STEVEN)
December 14, 2020 Filing 60 Request for Default by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION against Keenan and Associates. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(MITNICK, STEVEN)
December 14, 2020 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION as to Defendant, Sendero Health Plans, only (MITNICK, STEVEN)
December 14, 2020 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION as to Defendant, International Benefits Administration, only (MITNICK, STEVEN)
December 14, 2020 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION as to Defendant, Keenan & Associates only (MITNICK, STEVEN)
December 11, 2020 Filing 56 Letter re #55 Status Conference. (MITNICK, STEVEN)
December 8, 2020 Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Status Conference held via zoom on 12/8/2020. (Court Reporter/Recorder Carol Farrell.) (jmm, )
December 2, 2020 Filing 54 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant, Health Partners of Minnesota, only by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (MITNICK, STEVEN)
November 24, 2020 Filing 53 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant, National General Insurance, only by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (MITNICK, STEVEN)
November 24, 2020 Filing 52 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant, Great American Insurance Company, only by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (MITNICK, STEVEN)
November 19, 2020 Filing 51 AMENDED ANSWER to to Plaintiff's Complaint, Answer to all Crossclaims #34 Answer to Complaint,,,, Crossclaim,,, by CONTINENTAL BENEFITS. (PICKLES, JOYCE)
October 30, 2020 Filing 50 DEFENDANT, CONTINENTAL BENEFITS, LLC's ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim by CONTINENTAL BENEFITS.(PICKLES, JOYCE)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to answer as to Defendant, HEALTH PARTNERS OF MINNESOTA, until 12/01/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/29/2020. (jdb)
October 28, 2020 Filing 48 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer by HEALTH PARTNERS OF MINNESOTA. (SCHWARTZ, JOSEPH)
October 28, 2020 CLERK'S TEXT ORDER - The Application for Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer document #47 submitted by CONTINENTAL BENEFITS on 10/28/2020 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/16/2020. (mg)
October 28, 2020 Filing 47 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to CONTINENTAL BENEFITS.. (PICKLES, JOYCE)
October 28, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by JOYCE S. PICKLES on behalf of CONTINENTAL BENEFITS (PICKLES, JOYCE)
October 12, 2020 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Medova Health Care Financial Group, LLC re #32 MOTION to Dismiss (NAGI, JASON)
October 12, 2020 Filing 44 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by HEALTHCOMP, LLC re #14 MOTION to Dismiss (HANAN, MICHAEL)
October 12, 2020 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Support filed by KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC. re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (TIMONEY, PATRICK)
October 9, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH L. SCHWARTZ on behalf of HEALTH PARTNERS OF MINNESOTA (SCHWARTZ, JOSEPH)
October 8, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The STIPULATION of Dismissal documents #39 & #40 submitted by Steven Mitnick on 10/6/2020 and 10/8/2020 appear to be duplicates. These submissions will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (mg)
October 8, 2020 Filing 41 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant, Nationwide, only by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (MITNICK, STEVEN)
October 8, 2020 Filing 40 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant, Geico, only by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (MITNICK, STEVEN)
October 6, 2020 Filing 39 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant, Geico, only by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (MITNICK, STEVEN)
October 5, 2020 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION re #14 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(MITNICK, STEVEN)
October 5, 2020 Filing 37 BRIEF in Opposition filed by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(MITNICK, STEVEN)
October 5, 2020 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION re #32 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(MITNICK, STEVEN)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 LETTER ORDER granting Defendant's request to serve and file a responsive pleading to the Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 10/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/05/2020. (jdb)
October 2, 2020 Filing 34 National General Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND Answer to All Crossclaims, Demand for Trial By Jury, Designation of Trial Counsel, CROSSCLAIM for Indemnification against CHRISTIAN BROTHERS SERVICES, COMMUNITY HEALTH CHOICE, CONSUMER COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, CONTINENTAL BENEFITS, FRATES BENEFITS ADMINISTRATORS, GALLAGHER BASSETT SERVICES, INC., GEICO, GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, GROUP AND PENSION ADMINISTRATORS, INC., HEALTH PARTNERS OF MINNESOTA, HEALTHCOMP, LLC, HOCHHEIM PRAIRIE INSURANCE, INTERNATIONAL BENEFITS ADMINISTRATION, KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC., KEENAN & ASSOCIATES, LIFESTYLES HEALTH PLANS, Medova Health Care Financial Group, LLC, NATIONWIDE, SENDERO HEALTH PLANS, UHA HEALTH INSURANCE by NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE.(DELANO, MARIO)
September 30, 2020 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CONSUMER COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(MOURTZANAKIS, MICHAEL)
September 25, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #32 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 10/19/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mg)
September 25, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss by Medova Health Care Financial Group, LLC. Responses due by 10/5/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dimiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(NAGI, JASON)
September 25, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON A. NAGI on behalf of Medova Health Care Financial Group, LLC (NAGI, JASON)
September 24, 2020 Filing 30 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant, Healthsmart Benefits Management, LLC by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (MITNICK, STEVEN)
September 24, 2020 Filing 29 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant, Christus Health Plan by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (MITNICK, STEVEN)
September 24, 2020 Filing 28 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant, Healthscope Benefits by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (MITNICK, STEVEN)
September 24, 2020 Filing 27 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant, Government Employees Health Association, Inc. a/k/a GEHA by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (MITNICK, STEVEN)
September 24, 2020 Filing 26 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant, Fred Loya Insurance by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (MITNICK, STEVEN)
September 21, 2020 Filing 25 BRIEF in Opposition filed by COMMUNITY HEALTH CHOICE re #9 Cross MOTION to Remand PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1446 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(HARRINGTON, ROGER)
September 21, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 10/19/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mg)
September 21, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.. Responses due by 10/19/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(TIMONEY, PATRICK)
September 21, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(MITNICK, STEVEN)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to answer as to Defendant NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY for a period of 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 09/17/2020. (jdb)
September 16, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer as to Defendant National General Insurance Company by NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE. (DELANO, MARIO)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for Defendant KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC. to respond to the Complaint until 10/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 09/16/2020. (jdb)
September 15, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer Complaint by KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.. (TIMONEY, PATRICK)
September 15, 2020 Clerk's Text Order- The Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order document #18 submitted by NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE on 9/15/2020 has been DENIED due to it is beyond the scope of what the Clerk can grant. This request has been forwarded to Chambers. (mg)
September 15, 2020 Filing 18 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to National General Insurance Company.. (DELANO, MARIO)
September 14, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please review the Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order attached to docket entry #15 submitted by M. DELANO on 9/14/2020. If this document was attached in error, PLEASE RESUBMIT THE CORRECT DOCUMENT. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mg)
September 14, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 10/19/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mg)
September 14, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Support filed by COMMUNITY HEALTH CHOICE re #4 MOTION to Sever (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HARRINGTON, ROGER)
September 14, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Support filed by COMMUNITY HEALTH CHOICE re #3 MOTION to Dismiss or, alternatively, Motion to Transfer (Attachments: #1 Certification Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Service)(HARRINGTON, ROGER)
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to National General Ins. Co.. Attorney MARIO J. DELANO for NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE added. (DELANO, MARIO)
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by HEALTHCOMP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(HANAN, MICHAEL)
September 8, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #9 Cross MOTION to Remand PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1446. Motion set for 10/5/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mg)
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Service)(MITNICK, STEVEN)
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION re #4 MOTION to Sever (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Service)(MITNICK, STEVEN)
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION re #10 Response in Opposition to Motion (MITNICK, STEVEN)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION re #3 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(MITNICK, STEVEN)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 Cross MOTION to Remand PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1446 by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(MITNICK, STEVEN)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER- The Initial rule 16 conference scheduled for October 5, 2020 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni is adjourned with no new date. Parties are to notify the Court upon decision of the pending motion to dismiss. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm)
September 2, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 10/5/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by FRATES BENEFITS ADMINISTRATORS. Responses due by 9/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Brief, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(MARRONE, MATTHEW)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by SAMUEL J. THOMAS on behalf of GALLAGHER BASSETT SERVICES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certificate of Service)(THOMAS, SAMUEL)
August 27, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 9/21/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by GROUP AND PENSION ADMINISTRATORS, INC.. Responses due by 9/8/2020 (TIMONEY, PATRICK)
August 26, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss , #4 MOTION to Sever . Motion set for 9/21/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Sever by COMMUNITY HEALTH CHOICE. (Attachments: #1 Brief Mmemorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(HARRINGTON, ROGER)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by COMMUNITY HEALTH CHOICE. Responses due by 9/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(HARRINGTON, ROGER)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2020 02:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 08/19/2020. (jdb)
August 19, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (abr, )
August 19, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information Should be entered in ALL CAPS . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (eaj)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by community health choice from Superior Court of New Jersey (Hunterdon County, Law Division), case number L-239-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11230209), filed by community health choice. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Index N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y)(HARRINGTON, ROGER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION v. CHRISTIAN BROTHERS SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL BENEFITS ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc
Represented By: PATRICK C. TIMONEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE
Represented By: MARIO J. DELANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRATES BENEFITS ADMINISTRATORS
Represented By: MATTHEW S. MARRONE
Represented By: Zandra E Foley
Represented By: Steven Augustine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOCHHEIM PRAIRIE INSURANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEALTHSCOPE BENEFITS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Loya Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SENDERO HEALTH PLANS
Represented By: Nicole H. Munoz
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UHA HEALTH INSURANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medova Health Care Financial Group, LLC
Represented By: JASON A. NAGI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSUMER COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL A. MOURTZANAKIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTIAN BROTHERS SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES HEALTH ASSOCIATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEALTHCOMP, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL S. HANAN
Represented By: Mark Wesley Thayer
Represented By: Laura E. De Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Health Choice
Represented By: ROGER J. HARRINGTON
Represented By: John Bruce Shely
Represented By: Kelsey Jenae Hope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFESTYLES HEALTH PLANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group and Pension Administrators Inc
Represented By: PATRICK C. TIMONEY
Represented By: William Joel Akins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallagher Bassett Services Inc
Represented By: SAMUEL J. THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTINENTAL BENEFITS
Represented By: JOYCE S. PICKLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEENAN & ASSOCIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christus Health Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEALTHSMART BENEFITS MANAGEMENTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEALTH PARTNERS OF MINNESOTA
Represented By: Joseph L Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION
Represented By: STEVEN J. MITNICK
Represented By: Matthew Dennis Giadrosich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?