Brooks v. The State Of Texas
Plaintiff: Ronnie Ray Brooks
Defendant: The State Of Texas
Case Number: 4:2021cv00321
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Pltf to submit Complaint on proper form and pay the filing fee of $402.00 or submit an ifp w/trust fund data sheet...*** Notice of Compliance due by 4/12/2021 - complaint & ifp/data sheet due. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
February 24, 2021 Filing 4 Letter from Ronnie Ray Brooks re: providing a prison account statement within a reasonable time., filed. (rguerrero, 4)
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 CLERKS NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING as to Ronnie Ray Brooks. Parties notified Notice of Compliance due by 3/4/2021, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix) (bgoolsby, 4)
February 2, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (bgoolsby, 4)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against The State Of Texas (Filing fee $ 402) filed by Ronnie Ray Brooks.(ShadiaNash, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. The State Of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Ray Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State Of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?