Ragan v. Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Jr. Ragan and Ronald Ragan, Jr.
Defendant: VOP Motors LLC, Crest Cadillac II LLC, Vandergriff Automotive II LLC, PFVT Motors LLC, SFVT Investors LLC, 10C Motors LLC, Midway Holdings 1 LLC, CTVT Motors Inc., TOHVT Motors LLC, RCJD Motors LLC, HFWBH Motors LLC, Crown Automotive Inc., William Bill Epperson, TXVT LLC, BHVT Motors LLC, Luke Motor Company, Reliable Imports & Motorhomes LLC, Van Tuyl Group LLC d/b/a Berkshire Hathaway Automotive, husker Autogroup LLC, Midway Chevrolet Company 1 LLC, John Doe Dealership Entities 1-200, FLTVT LLC, Lone Star Buick GMC II LLC, John Doe General Managers 1-200, GAFVT Motors LLC, Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., ARTex Automotive Sales II LLC, GMVT Motors LLC, PIVT Motors LLC, LVN Motors LLC, Luke Motor Company II LLC, Berkshire Hathaway Automotive Inc., Kenny Kent Chevrolet Co. LLC, Reliable Chevrolet II TX LLC, ACVT Motors LLC, KTVT Motors LLC, Van Chevrolet Cadillac LLC, GPVN Motors LLC, Miles Chevrolet Inc., Showcase Automotive LLC, NPTBH Motors LLC, Elite Automotive Group LLC, Town East Ford II LLC, RVWVT Motors Inc., Evansville Automotive LEX LLC, Richardson Automotive II LLC, DBVT Motors LLC., Showcase Motors LLC, CAVT LLC, ABC Nissan LLC, Reliable Motors AU LLC, Reliable Chevrolet Inc., PNVT Motors LLC, Reliable Chevrolet MO LLC, Vandergriff Hyundai II LLC, Joey Myers Ford II LLC, Joe Myers Automotive LLC, Pinnacle Nissan LLC, NMVT Motors LLC, Stonebriar Chevrolet LLC, Vandergriff Automotive II LP, IRVTex Automotive Sales Inc., Joe Myers Automotive Three LLC, DMVW Motors LLC, Vandergriff Chevrolet Inc., Grand Prairie Ford LLC, Jeffrey C. Ranchor, Crest Inifinity Inc., FSVT Motors LLC, SSLVT Motors LLC, Reliable Automotive LLC, Bell Road Motors LLC, Van Hyundai II LLC, Richard Automotive Inc., Larry Van Tuyl, ARText Automotive Sales Inc., VODVT Motors LLC, Grapevine Imports LLC, CBV Motors Inc, Evansville Automotive LLC, TODVT LLC, GANVT Motors Inc, CHVT Motors LLC, VT Motors LLC, Crest Cadillac Inc., Serramonte Ford Inc., IRVTex Automotive Sales II LLC, Crest Infiniti II LLC, Reliable Chevrolet NM LLC, Infinity of Scottsdale LLC, MCVT Motors LLC and GAPVT Motors Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00339
Filed: February 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Filing 106 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 31, 2021 Filing 105 Summons Issued as to William Bill Epperson. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JacquelineMata, 4)
March 30, 2021 Filing 104 Request for Issuance of Summons as to William Bill Epperson, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 29, 2021 Filing 103 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to 10C Motors LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 29, 2021 Filing 102 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Miles Chevrolet Inc. served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 29, 2021 Filing 101 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to NMVT Motors LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 29, 2021 Filing 100 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to NPTBH Motors LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 29, 2021 Filing 99 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 29, 2021 Filing 98 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to PFVT Motors LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 29, 2021 Filing 97 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 96 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Pinnacle Nissan LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 95 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to PIVT Motors LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 94 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to PNVT Motors LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 93 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to RCJD Motors LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 92 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Reliable Automotive LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 91 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Reliable Chevrolet MO LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 90 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Reliable Chevrolet NM LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 89 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Reliable Chevrolet II TX LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 88 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Reliable Chevrolet Inc. served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 87 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Reliable Imports & Motorhomes LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 86 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Reliable Motors AU LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 85 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Richardson Automotive II LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 84 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to RVWVT Motors Inc. served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 83 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Serramonte Ford Inc. served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 82 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to SFVT Investors LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 81 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Showcase Automotive LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 80 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Showcase Motors LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 79 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to SSLVT Motors LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 78 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Stonebriar Chevrolet LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 77 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to TODVT LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 76 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to TOHVT Motors LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 75 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Town East Ford II LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 74 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to TXVT LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 73 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Van Chevrolet Cadillac LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 72 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Van Hyundai II LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 71 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Van Tuyl Group LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 70 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Vandergriff Chevrolet Inc. served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 69 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Vandergriff Automotive II LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 68 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Vandergriff Automotive II LP served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 67 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Vandergriff Hyundai II LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 66 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to VODVT Motors LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 65 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to VOP Motors LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 64 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to VT Motors LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 63 Summons Issued as to Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. (doc. #14 ) Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Larry Van Tuyl doc. #15 )(rcastro, 4)
March 23, 2021 Filing 62 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Midway Holdings 1 LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 61 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Midway Chevrolet Company 1 LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 60 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to MCVT Motors LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 59 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to LVN Motors LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 58 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Luke Motor Company II LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 57 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Luke Motor Company served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 56 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Lone Star Buick GMC II LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 55 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to KTVT Motors LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 54 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Kenny Kent Chevrolet Co. LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 53 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Joey Myers Ford II LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 52 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Joe Myers Automotive Three LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 51 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Joe Myers Automotive LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 50 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jeffrey C. Ranchor served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 49 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to IRVTex Automotive Sales Inc. served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 48 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to IRVTex Automotive Sales II LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 47 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Infinity of Scottsdale LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 46 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to husker Autogroup LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to HFWBH Motors LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Grapevine Imports LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Grand Prairie Ford LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to GPVN Motors LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to GMVT Motors LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to GANVT Motors Inc served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to GAFVT Motors LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to FSVT Motors LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to FLTVT LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Evansville Automotive LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Evansville Automotive LEX LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Elite Automotive Group LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to DMVW Motors LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to DBVT Motors LLC. served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to CTVT Motors Inc. served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Crown Automotive Inc. served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Crest Inifinity Inc. served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Crest Infiniti II LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Crest Cadillac Inc. served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Crest Cadillac II LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to CHVT Motors LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to CBV Motors Inc served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to CAVT LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to BHVT Motors LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Berkshire Hathaway Automotive Inc. served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Bell Road Motors LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to ARText Automotive Sales Inc. served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to ARTex Automotive Sales II LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to ACVT Motors LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to ABC Nissan LLC served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 21, 2021 Filing 15 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Larry Van Tuyl, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
March 21, 2021 Filing 14 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
February 23, 2021 Filing 13 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Kenneth N. Caldwell re: #5 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. An updated address could not be found. (JacquelineMata, 4)
February 18, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ronald Jr. Ragan, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Andrew Grimm to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Gregory Keenan to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
February 10, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to William Bill Epperson. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (JacquelineMata, 4)
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 Request for Issuance of Summons as to William Bill Epperson, filed.(Caldwell, Kenneth)
February 9, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Gregory Keenan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ronald Jr. Ragan, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/2/2021. (Caldwell, Kenneth)
February 9, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Andrew Grimm to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ronald Jr. Ragan, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/2/2021. (Caldwell, Kenneth)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Kenneth N. Caldwell to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
February 3, 2021 Filing 4 Register of Copyrights Notified. AO-121, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ShadiaNashadi, 4)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(ShadiaNashadi, 4)
February 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Kenneth N. Caldwell to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/23/2021. (jguajardo, 4)
February 2, 2021 Confirmation of receipt of payment from Kenneth N. Caldwell in the amount of $ 402.00 re: #1 Complaint. Receipt date: 2/2/2021. Receipt number HOU100302. Purpose Description: FULL CIVIL FILING FEE. (jguajardo, 4)
February 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ronald Jr. Ragan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jguajardo, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ragan v. Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VOP Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crest Cadillac II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vandergriff Automotive II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFVT Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFVT Investors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10C Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midway Holdings 1 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTVT Motors Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOHVT Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCJD Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HFWBH Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Automotive Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Bill Epperson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TXVT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHVT Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliable Imports & Motorhomes LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Tuyl Group LLC d/b/a Berkshire Hathaway Automotive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: husker Autogroup LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midway Chevrolet Company 1 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Dealership Entities 1-200
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLTVT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lone Star Buick GMC II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe General Managers 1-200
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAFVT Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Hathaway, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARTex Automotive Sales II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMVT Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PIVT Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVN Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Motor Company II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Hathaway Automotive Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny Kent Chevrolet Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliable Chevrolet II TX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACVT Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KTVT Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Chevrolet Cadillac LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPVN Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles Chevrolet Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Showcase Automotive LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NPTBH Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Automotive Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town East Ford II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RVWVT Motors Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evansville Automotive LEX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richardson Automotive II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBVT Motors LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Showcase Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAVT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Nissan LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliable Motors AU LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliable Chevrolet Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNVT Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliable Chevrolet MO LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vandergriff Hyundai II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey Myers Ford II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Myers Automotive LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Nissan LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NMVT Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stonebriar Chevrolet LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vandergriff Automotive II LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRVTex Automotive Sales Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Myers Automotive Three LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMVW Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vandergriff Chevrolet Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Prairie Ford LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey C. Ranchor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crest Inifinity Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FSVT Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSLVT Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliable Automotive LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell Road Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Hyundai II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Automotive Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Van Tuyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARText Automotive Sales Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VODVT Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grapevine Imports LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBV Motors Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evansville Automotive LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODVT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GANVT Motors Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHVT Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VT Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crest Cadillac Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serramonte Ford Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRVTex Automotive Sales II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crest Infiniti II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliable Chevrolet NM LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity of Scottsdale LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCVT Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAPVT Motors Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Jr. Ragan
Represented By: Kenneth N. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Ragan, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth N. Caldwell
Represented By: Andrew Grimm
Represented By: Kenneth Caldwell
Represented By: Gregory Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?