McIntosh v. Ray et al
Plaintiff: Richard McIntosh
Defendant: Harris County, Deputy A.N. Ray, Harris County Sheriff's Office, Deputy McHugh, Sergeant King and Deputy Bass
Case Number: 4:2021cv00455
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Charles Eskridge
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Filing 25 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Richard McIntosh, filed.(Cantu, Roberto)
April 1, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY in Support of #18 MOTION to Dismiss #15 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. , filed by Harris County, Harris County Sheriff's Office. (Butt, James)
March 30, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition to #18 MOTION to Dismiss #15 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. , filed by Richard McIntosh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Horwitz, Noah)
March 30, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah M. Horwitz on behalf of Richard McIntosh, filed. (Horwitz, Noah)
March 29, 2021 MINUTE ENTRY re: The initial conference set for 04/08/2021 is reset to 04/29/2021 to allow full briefing and argument on #18 the motion to dismiss by Defendants Harris County and Harris County Sherriff's Office. The parties must also provide a joint discovery/case management plan as ordered in accord with section 9(b) of this Court's procedures by 04/12/2021. Initial Conference reset for 4/29/2021 at 01:30 PM in by video before Judge Charles Eskridge (jengonzalez, 4) Modified on 3/30/2021 (jengonzalez, 4).
March 12, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Deputy Bass, filed.(Butt, James)
March 12, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Sergeant King, Deputy McHugh, filed.(Butt, James)
March 9, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Richard McIntosh, filed.(Cantu, Roberto)
March 9, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss #15 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Harris County, Harris County Sheriff's Office, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Butt, James)
March 9, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Service by Deputy Bass, Harris County, Harris County Sheriff's Office, Sergeant King, Deputy McHugh, filed. (Butt, James)
March 9, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Deputy Bass, Harris County, Harris County Sheriff's Office, Sergeant King, Deputy McHugh, filed.(Butt, James)
March 5, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Richard McIntosh.(Cantu, Roberto)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 06/10/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 05/11/2021. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 12/07/2021. Deft Expert Report due by 01/06/2022. Discovery due by 02/23/2022. Mediation due by 05/10/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 03/25/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 03/25/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 06/09/2022. Docket Call set for 07/18/2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jengonzalezadi) (Entered: 03/05/2021)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendants Harris County and Harris County Sheriff's Office are granted leave to file their answers or responses to Plaintiff's first amended complaint on or before 03/12/2021.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
March 4, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Consent of Removal by Deputy Bass, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Butt, James)
March 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE Certificate of Service in Removed Action by Harris County, Harris County Sheriff's Office, Sergeant King, Deputy McHugh, filed. (Butt, James)
March 4, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE Statement of Information in Removed Action by Harris County, Harris County Sheriff's Office, Sergeant King, Deputy McHugh, filed. (Butt, James)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/8/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4)
March 3, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Motion to Dismiss by Harris County, Harris County Sheriff's Office, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Butt, James)
February 23, 2021 Filing 7 Certificate of Written Discovery by Sergeant King, Deputy McHugh, filed.(Butt, James)
February 22, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sergeant King, Deputy McHugh, filed.(Butt, James)
February 22, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal by Sergeant King, Deputy McHugh, filed.(Butt, James)
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Sergeant King, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Butt, James)
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Consent of Removal by Deputy McHugh, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Butt, James)
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Harris County, filed.(Butt, James)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 127th Judicial District Court Harris County, case number 2020-75634 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25946075) filed by Harris County. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit List of Counsel, #3 Exhibit State Removal Notice, #4 Exhibit Index of Matters, #5 Exhibit Certified State Court Filings)(Butt, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McIntosh v. Ray et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris County
Represented By: James Carroll Butt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy A.N. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: James Carroll Butt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy McHugh
Represented By: James Carroll Butt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant King
Represented By: James Carroll Butt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Bass
Represented By: James Carroll Butt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard McIntosh
Represented By: Noah Morrie Horwitz
Represented By: Roberto Omar Cantu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?