First Colony Community Services Association, Inc. v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: First Colony Community Services Association, Inc.
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00458
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed.(Hess, Vincent)
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur E. Anthony on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed. (Anthony, Arthur)
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert T. Mowrey on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed. (Mowrey, Robert)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/14/2021 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 458th Judicial District Court Fort Bend County TX, case number 21DCV279674 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25948222) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit index of matters being filed, #2 Exhibit civil cover sheet, #3 Exhibit plaintiff's original petition, app for TI and perm TI and request for disclosure, #4 Exhibit request for process, #5 Exhibit citation, #6 Exhibit plaintiff's original answer and request for disclosures, #7 Exhibit affidavit of service, #8 Exhibit copy of state court civil docket sheet (register of actions), #9 Exhibit list of all counsel of record, #10 Exhibit fort bend county appraisal district valuation of property)(Hess, Vincent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Colony Community Services Association, Inc. v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Vincent J Hess
Represented By: Arthur E Anthony
Represented By: Robert T Mowrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Colony Community Services Association, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Margaret McLain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?