Jester v. RS Diving Contractor GmbH et al
Plaintiff: Garrett Jester
Defendant: Andreas Stutz, RS Diving Contractor GmbH, Pieter Frank Van Dam, Smallengange Law Firm, Kurt Rohde, RS Offshore Verwaltungs GmbH, British Marine, Christian Schachta, William Boonk, Roland Jurgen Kalis, RS Offshore Ship GmbH & Co. KG, Oliver Schultz and Andre Lang
Case Number: 4:2021cv00476
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Remand filed by William Boonk, British Marine, Pieter Frank Van Dam, Roland Jurgen Kalis, Andre Lang, RS Diving Contractor GmbH, RS Offshore Ship GmbH & Co. KG, RS Offshore Verwaltungs GmbH, Kurt Rohde, Christian Schachta, Oliver Schultz, Smallengange Law Firm, Andreas Stutz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Matthews, Marcus)
April 1, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY in Support of #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, for Insufficient Service of Process, and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted, filed by William Boonk, British Marine, Pieter Frank Van Dam, Roland Jurgen Kalis, Andre Lang, RS Diving Contractor GmbH, RS Offshore Ship GmbH & Co. KG, RS Offshore Verwaltungs GmbH, Kurt Rohde, Christian Schachta, Oliver Schultz, Smallengange Law Firm, Andreas Stutz. (Matthews, Marcus)
March 25, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition to #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, for Insufficient Service of Process, and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted, filed by Garrett Jester. (Stewart, Joe)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Terminating as moot #9 Motion for extension of time; Granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time (response to motion to dismiss due 3/25/2021).(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
March 18, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time Response to Rule 12(b) Motion to Dismiss by Garrett Jester, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stewart, Joe)
March 15, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by Garrett Jester, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stewart, Joe)
March 11, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION Extension of Time by Garrett Jester, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stewart, Joe)
March 11, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Garrett Jester, filed.(Stewart, Joe)
March 9, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by William Boonk, British Marine, Pieter Frank Van Dam, Roland Jurgen Kalis, Andre Lang, RS Diving Contractor GmbH, RS Offshore Ship GmbH & Co. KG, RS Offshore Verwaltungs GmbH, Kurt Rohde, Christian Schachta, Oliver Schultz, Smallengange Law Firm, Andreas Stutz, filed.(Matthews, Marcus)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 4/30/2021(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
February 19, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT in a Removed Case by William Boonk, British Marine, Pieter Frank Van Dam, Roland Jurgen Kalis, Andre Lang, RS Diving Contractor GmbH, RS Offshore Ship GmbH & Co. KG, RS Offshore Verwaltungs GmbH, Kurt Rohde, Christian Schachta, Oliver Schultz, Smallengange Law Firm, Andreas Stutz, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Matthews, Marcus)
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, for Insufficient Service of Process, and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by William Boonk, British Marine, Pieter Frank Van Dam, Roland Jurgen Kalis, Andre Lang, RS Diving Contractor GmbH, RS Offshore Ship GmbH & Co. KG, RS Offshore Verwaltungs GmbH, Kurt Rohde, Christian Schachta, Oliver Schultz, Smallengange Law Firm, Andreas Stutz, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Proposed Order)(Matthews, Marcus)
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by William Boonk, British Marine, Pieter Frank Van Dam, Roland Jurgen Kalis, Andre Lang, RS Diving Contractor GmbH, RS Offshore Ship GmbH & Co. KG, RS Offshore Verwaltungs GmbH, Kurt Rohde, Christian Schachta, Oliver Schultz, Smallengange Law Firm, Andreas Stutz, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Matthews, Marcus)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order in Removed Cases. Statement due within ten days. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(ShadiaNashadi, 4)
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 333rd Judicial District Court, case number 2019-34471 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25956440) filed by Andreas Stutz, Smallengange Law Firm, RS Offshore Ship GmbH & Co. KG, Oliver Schultz, Andre Lang, RS Diving Contractor GmbH, William Boonk, British Marine, Roland Jurgen Kalis, RS Offshore Verwaltungs GmbH, Christian Schachta, Pieter Frank Van Dam, Kurt Rohde. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Matthews, Marcus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jester v. RS Diving Contractor GmbH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andreas Stutz
Represented By: Marcus Grant Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RS Diving Contractor GmbH
Represented By: Marcus Grant Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pieter Frank Van Dam
Represented By: Marcus Grant Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smallengange Law Firm
Represented By: Marcus Grant Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Rohde
Represented By: Marcus Grant Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RS Offshore Verwaltungs GmbH
Represented By: Marcus Grant Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: British Marine
Represented By: Marcus Grant Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Schachta
Represented By: Marcus Grant Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Boonk
Represented By: Marcus Grant Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland Jurgen Kalis
Represented By: Marcus Grant Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RS Offshore Ship GmbH & Co. KG
Represented By: Marcus Grant Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oliver Schultz
Represented By: Marcus Grant Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Lang
Represented By: Marcus Grant Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrett Jester
Represented By: Joe Steven Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?