Plymouth County Retirement System v. Apache Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Plymouth County Retirement System
Defendant: John J. Christmann, IV, Steven Keenan, Stephen J. Riney, Timothy J. Sullivan and Apache Corporation
Case Number: 4:2021cv00575
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Apache Corporation, John J. Christmann, IV, Steven Keenan, Stephen J. Riney, Timothy J. Sullivan, filed.(Sterling, David)
April 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Pharr Hefley on behalf of Apache Corporation, John J. Christmann, IV, Steven Keenan, Stephen J. Riney, Timothy J. Sullivan, filed. (Hefley, Amy)
April 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David D. Sterling on behalf of Apache Corporation, John J. Christmann, IV, Steven Keenan, Stephen J. Riney, Timothy J. Sullivan, filed. (Sterling, David)
March 11, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Plymouth County Retirement System, filed.(Edwards, John)
February 24, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John S. "Jack" Edwards, Jr. on behalf of Plymouth County Retirement System, filed. (Edwards, John)
February 24, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(ShadiaNash, 4)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JacquelineMataadi, 4)
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Ajamie, Thomas)
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26004494) filed by Plymouth County Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ajamie, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plymouth County Retirement System v. Apache Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. Christmann, IV
Represented By: Amy Pharr Hefley
Represented By: David D Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Keenan
Represented By: Amy Pharr Hefley
Represented By: David D Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen J. Riney
Represented By: Amy Pharr Hefley
Represented By: David D Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J. Sullivan
Represented By: Amy Pharr Hefley
Represented By: David D Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apache Corporation
Represented By: Amy Pharr Hefley
Represented By: David D Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plymouth County Retirement System
Represented By: Thomas Robert Ajamie
Represented By: John Saul Edwards, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?