Feldman et al v. Sullivan et al DO NOT DOCKET IN 4:21-CV-682. CASE IS CONSOLIDATED UNDER 4:20-CV-2236
Plaintiff: Stewart A Feldman, PoolRe Insurance Corporation, Capstone Associate Services, Ltd., Capstone Associated Services (Wyoming), LP, The Feldman Law Firm LLP, Capstone Insurance Management, Ltd. and Jeff Carlson
Defendant: Scott Sullivan, Doctor Scott Sullivan, St. Charles Holdings, LLC, Center for Restorative Breast Surgery, LLC, Cerberus Insurance Corporation, Sigma Delta Building, LLC, Janus Insurance Corporation, Frank Dellacroce, Sunrise Productions, LLC, St. Charles Surgical Hospital, LLC and Orion Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 4:2021cv00682
Filed: March 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES: Lead Case No. 4:20-CV-2236 and Member Case No. 4:21-CV-658 & 4:21-CV-682 (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
March 21, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Resetting of Arbitration Hearing Date by Center for Restorative Breast Surgery, LLC, Cerberus Insurance Corporation, Frank Dellacroce, Janus Insurance Corporation, Orion Insurance Corporation, Sigma Delta Building, LLC, St. Charles Holdings, LLC, St. Charles Surgical Hospital, LLC, Scott Sullivan, Sunrise Productions, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Garner, James)
March 19, 2021 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT to #4 AMENDED #2 MOTION, #9 Document by Capstone Associate Services, Ltd., Capstone Associated Services (Wyoming), LP, Capstone Insurance Management, Ltd., Jeff Carlson, Stewart A Feldman, PoolRe Insurance Corporation, The Feldman Law Firm LLP, filed.(Gorman, Edward)
March 16, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Resetting of Arbitration Date re: #5 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION In Aid of Stay of Arbitration by Center for Restorative Breast Surgery, LLC, Cerberus Insurance Corporation, Frank Dellacroce, Janus Insurance Corporation, Orion Insurance Corporation, Sigma Delta Building, LLC, St. Charles Holdings, LLC, St. Charles Surgical Hospital, LLC, Scott Sullivan, Sunrise Productions, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Garner, James)
March 16, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING OF STATE COURT PROCESS, PLEADINGS AND ORDERS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1446(a) AND 28 U.S.C. 1447(B) re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Center for Restorative Breast Surgery, LLC, Cerberus Insurance Corporation, Frank Dellacroce, Janus Insurance Corporation, Orion Insurance Corporation, Sigma Delta Building, LLC, St. Charles Holdings, LLC, St. Charles Surgical Hospital, LLC, Scott Sullivan, Sunrise Productions, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 State pleadings, #3 State pleadings, #4 State pleadings, #5 State pleadings, #6 State pleadings, #7 State pleadings, #8 State pleadings, #9 State pleadings, #10 State pleadings, #11 State pleadings, #12 State pleadings, #13 State pleadings, #14 State pleadings, #15 State pleadings, #16 State pleadings, #17 State pleadings, #18 State pleadings, #19 State pleadings, #20 State pleadings, #21 State pleadings)(Garner, James)
March 10, 2021 Filing 9 Letter to Judge Hittner by The Feldman Law Firm LLP, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Greenberg, Joseph)
March 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing of Emergency Motion to Transfer and Consolidate In Related Case by Center for Restorative Breast Surgery, LLC, Cerberus Insurance Corporation, Frank Dellacroce, Janus Insurance Corporation, Orion Insurance Corporation, Sigma Delta Building, LLC, St. Charles Holdings, LLC, St. Charles Surgical Hospital, LLC, Scott Sullivan, Sunrise Productions, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Garner, James)
March 7, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Transfer Case to Honorable Lee Rosenthal by Center for Restorative Breast Surgery, LLC, Cerberus Insurance Corporation, Frank Dellacroce, Janus Insurance Corporation, Orion Insurance Corporation, Sigma Delta Building, LLC, St. Charles Holdings, LLC, St. Charles Surgical Hospital, LLC, Scott Sullivan, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Garner, James)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(JacquelineMataadi, 4)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 EMERGENCY MOTION, MOTION In Aid of Stay of Arbitration( Motion Docket Date 3/24/2021.) by Center for Restorative Breast Surgery, LLC, Cerberus Insurance Corporation, Frank Dellacroce, Janus Insurance Corporation, Orion Insurance Corporation, Sigma Delta Building, LLC, St. Charles Holdings, LLC, St. Charles Surgical Hospital, LLC, Scott Sullivan, Sunrise Productions, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M)(Garner, James)
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED #2 MOTION by Stewart A Feldman, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Gorman, Edward)
March 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Litigation Pursuant to Local Rule 5.2 by Scott Sullivan, filed. (Garner, James)
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Remand( Motion Docket Date 3/23/2021.), MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Stewart A Feldman, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gorman, Edward)
March 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, case number 2021-1911 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26047071) filed by Scott Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 counsel list, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garner, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feldman et al v. Sullivan et al DO NOT DOCKET IN 4:21-CV-682. CASE IS CONSOLIDATED UNDER 4:20-CV-2236
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Sullivan
Represented By: James M Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Scott Sullivan
Represented By: James M Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Charles Holdings, LLC
Represented By: James M Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Center for Restorative Breast Surgery, LLC
Represented By: James M Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerberus Insurance Corporation
Represented By: James M Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sigma Delta Building, LLC
Represented By: James M Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janus Insurance Corporation
Represented By: James M Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Dellacroce
Represented By: James M Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Productions, LLC
Represented By: James M Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Charles Surgical Hospital, LLC
Represented By: James M Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orion Insurance Corporation
Represented By: James M Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stewart A Feldman
Represented By: Edward John Gorman
Represented By: Joseph F Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PoolRe Insurance Corporation
Represented By: John Zavitsanos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capstone Associate Services, Ltd.
Represented By: L Andy Paredes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capstone Associated Services (Wyoming), LP
Represented By: L Andy Paredes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Feldman Law Firm LLP
Represented By: Joseph F Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capstone Insurance Management, Ltd.
Represented By: L Andy Paredes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Carlson
Represented By: L Andy Paredes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?