ARC Medical Design Limited et al v. Medivators Inc., et al
Plaintiff: ARC MEDICAL DESIGN LIMITED and KEYMED (MEDICAL AND INDUSTRIAL EQUIPMENT) LIMITED
Defendant: CANTEL MEDICAL CORP. and MEDIVATORS INC.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00929
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition to #24 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Inter Partes Review Proceedings, filed by ARC Medical Design Limited, KeyMed (Medical and Industrial Equipment) Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Proposed Order)(Vidal, Katherine)
May 19, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle E. Friesen on behalf of Cantel Medical Corp., Medivators Inc., filed. (Friesen, Kyle)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for John D. Garretson to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
April 28, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for John D. Garretson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cantel Medical Corp., Medivators Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/19/2021. (Israel, Sharon)
April 28, 2021 Filing 24 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Inter Partes Review Proceedings by Cantel Medical Corp., Medivators Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Proposed Order)(Israel, Sharon)
April 28, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Cantel Medical Corp., Medivators Inc., filed.(Israel, Sharon)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time Responses due by 4/28/2021.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
April 14, 2021 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cantel Medical Corp., Medivators Inc., filed.(Israel, Sharon)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Lawrence Slusky to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
April 12, 2021 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint by Cantel Medical Corp., Medivators Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Israel, Sharon)
April 7, 2021 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ARC Medical Design Limited, KeyMed (Medical and Industrial Equipment) Limited, Olympus Corporation, filed.(Vidal, Katherine)
April 7, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ATTORNEY-IN-CHARGE by ARC Medical Design Limited, KeyMed (Medical and Industrial Equipment) Limited, Olympus Corporation, filed. (Vidal, Katherine)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Katherine Vidal to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
April 2, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for James Winn to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ARC Medical Design Limited, KeyMed (Medical and Industrial Equipment) Limited, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/23/2021. (mmapps, 4)
March 30, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Lawrence Slusky to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ARC Medical Design Limited, KeyMed (Medical and Industrial Equipment) Limited, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/20/2021. (mmapps, 4)
March 25, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Cantel Medical Corp. served on 3/24/2021, answer due 4/14/2021, filed.(Rueckheim, Michael)
March 25, 2021 Filing 12 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Medivators Inc. served on 3/24/2021, answer due 4/14/2021, filed.(Rueckheim, Michael)
March 25, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Katherine Vidal to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ARC Medical Design Limited, KeyMed (Medical and Industrial Equipment) Limited, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/15/2021. (Lutton, Katherine)
March 23, 2021 Filing 10 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4)
March 23, 2021 Filing 9 *** DOCKETED IN ERROR US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) Modified on 3/23/2021 (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/9/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
March 23, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to CANTEL MEDICAL CORP., MEDIVATORS INC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JacquelineMata, 4)
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE re Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by ARC MEDICAL DESIGN LIMITED, KEYMED (MEDICAL AND INDUSTRIAL EQUIPMENT) LIMITED, filed. (Rueckheim, Michael)
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Rueckheim on behalf of ARC MEDICAL DESIGN LIMITED, KEYMED (MEDICAL AND INDUSTRIAL EQUIPMENT) LIMITED, filed. (Rueckheim, Michael)
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ARC MEDICAL DESIGN LIMITED, KEYMED (MEDICAL AND INDUSTRIAL EQUIPMENT) LIMITED, filed.(Rueckheim, Michael)
March 22, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to CANTEL MEDICAL CORP., filed.(Rueckheim, Michael)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to MEDIVATORS INC., filed.(Rueckheim, Michael)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26148389) filed by ARC MEDICAL DESIGN LIMITED, KEYMED (MEDICAL AND INDUSTRIAL EQUIPMENT) LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A1, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit B1, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rueckheim, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARC Medical Design Limited et al v. Medivators Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANTEL MEDICAL CORP.
Represented By: Kyle Edward Friesen
Represented By: John D. Garretson
Represented By: Sharon Audrey Israel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDIVATORS INC.
Represented By: Kyle Edward Friesen
Represented By: John D. Garretson
Represented By: Sharon Audrey Israel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARC MEDICAL DESIGN LIMITED
Represented By: Michael Robert Rueckheim
Represented By: Lawrence Slusky
Represented By: James Winn
Represented By: Katherine Kelly Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEYMED (MEDICAL AND INDUSTRIAL EQUIPMENT) LIMITED
Represented By: Michael Robert Rueckheim
Represented By: Lawrence Slusky
Represented By: James Winn
Represented By: Katherine Kelly Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?