Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC et al v. Kerr Machine Co.
Plaintiff: Cizion, LLC d/b/a Vulcan Industrial Manufacturing, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC and Cizion, LLC doing business as Vulcan Industrial Manufacturing, LLC
Defendant: Kerr Machine Co.
Case Number: 4:2021cv01033
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Dismiss. Case terminated on 5/10/21.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
May 10, 2021 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/1/2021. (Davis, Joshua)
April 29, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss #3 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., #1 Complaint, by Kerr Machine Co., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/20/2021. (Melton, Brian)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Barry J. Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
April 15, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC, filed.(Davis, Joshua)
April 15, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Barry J. Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/6/2021. (Davis, Joshua)
April 15, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy L. Doyle on behalf of Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC, filed. (Davis, Joshua)
April 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean C. Frizzell on behalf of Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC, filed. (Davis, Joshua)
April 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Whittle on behalf of Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC, filed. (Davis, Joshua)
April 12, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Kerr Machine Co. served on 4/1/2021, answer due 4/22/2021, filed.(Davis, Joshua)
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MelissaMorganadi, 4)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/18/2021 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4)
March 30, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kerr Machine Co.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShadiaNash, 4)
March 30, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Kerr Machine Co. filed by Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Cizion, LLC d/b/a Vulcan Industrial Manufacturing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Davis, Joshua)
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Kerr Machine Co., filed.(Davis, Joshua)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kerr Machine Co. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26188332) filed by Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Cizion, LLC d/b/a Vulcan Industrial Manufacturing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC et al v. Kerr Machine Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerr Machine Co.
Represented By: Brian Douglas Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cizion, LLC d/b/a Vulcan Industrial Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Paul Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vulcan Energy Services, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Paul Davis
Represented By: Jean C Frizzell
Represented By: Barry Jeff Herman
Represented By: Jeffrey S Whittle
Represented By: Jeremy L Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Paul Davis
Represented By: Barry Jeff Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cizion, LLC doing business as Vulcan Industrial Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Paul Davis
Represented By: Barry Jeff Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?